Wince et al v. Thurston et al
Plaintiff: Marquisa Wince and Mary Cantwell
Defendant: Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, John Thurston, James Harmon Smith, III, James Sharp, Charles Roberts and Sharon Brooks
Case Number: 4:2020cv01274
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #22 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/24/2020. (kdr)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Marquisa Wince and Mary Cantwell's motion to dismiss; dismissing this case without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; and denying as moot #19 Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/24/2020. (kdr)
November 19, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Incorporated Brief by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tull, John)
November 6, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wagner, Vincent)
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM () by All Defendants (Wagner, Vincent)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #10 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/2020. (kdr)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: This case is consolidated sua sponte with 4:20-cv-1278 BSM. The clerk is directed to terminate case number 4:20-cv-1278 BSM. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/2020. (kdr)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Brian S. Miller: Hearing held on 10/28/2020 on Plaintiffs' request for a Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs call witnesses Mary Cantwell, Daniel Shults, and Susan Inman. Arguments made by plaintiffs and defense. The Court takes the matter under advisement, hearing concluded. (Plaintiff: John E. Tull III, Thomas Christoph Keller; Defense: Vincent Moore Wagner, Michael Allen Mosley; Court Reporter: Suzanne McKennon.) (rmg)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER authorizing Christoph Keller and John Tull to bring electronic devices into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock on Wednesday, 10/28/2020, for the hearing on plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction in the above styled case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/2020. (kdr)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Declaration of Daniel Shults)(Wagner, Vincent)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Cantrell on behalf of All Defendants (Cantrell, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Allen Mosley on behalf of All Defendants (Mosley, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince. (Tull, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince (Tull, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tull, John)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's motion to withdraw their motion to dismiss; directing the clerk to terminate #6 plaintiffs' motion to dismiss; granting plaintiff's motion for an expedited hearing; and setting a hearing on plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction for 1:00 p.m. on 10/28/2020, in Courtroom #2D in Little Rock. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/26/2020. (kdr)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw #6 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Incorporated Brief and Request for Hearing by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince (Tull, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Incorporated Brief by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tull, John) (WITHDRAWN pursuant to #8 Order.) Modified on 10/28/2020 (ljb).
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #4 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to randomly reassign this case to another District Judge. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/23/2020. (ljb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by All Defendants. (ljb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince. (ljb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-20-5928. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT079443. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wince et al v. Thurston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilenda Harris-Ritter
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Luther
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Harmon Smith, III
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sharp
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Roberts
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Brooks
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquisa Wince
Represented By: Christopher J. Keller
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cantwell
Represented By: Christopher J. Keller
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?