Wayne v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Harold Demetris Wayne
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv01279
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Commissioner's Motion for Extension of Time. The Commissioner's Answer and the certified administrative record must be filed no later than 2/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/18/2020. (kdr)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /transcript by Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Tucker, Eric)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Tucker on behalf of Social Security Administration (Tucker, Eric)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Harold Demetris Wayne. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT079475.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wayne v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Demetris Wayne
Represented By: Sheila F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Eric B. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?