Golden Eagle of Arkansas Inc v. Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Plaintiff: Golden Eagle of Arkansas Inc
Defendant: PepsiCo Inc and Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv01290
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due 1/5/2021. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/21/2020. (amr)
December 18, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (Oesch, Nathan)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. PepsiCo Inc answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/18/2020. (amr)
December 18, 2020 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by PepsiCo Inc (Keller, Thomas)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/9/2020. (amr)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. PepsiCo Inc answer due 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/9/2020. (amr)
December 7, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (Oesch, Nathan)
December 7, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by PepsiCo Inc (Keller, Thomas)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 , #24 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Separate Defendant, PepsiCo, Inc. Geoffrey Sigler and Joshua Wade are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/3/2020. (jbh)
December 1, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joshua Wade. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3874991. Filed by PepsiCo Inc (Keller, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Geoffrey Sigler. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3874984. Filed by PepsiCo Inc (Keller, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by PepsiCo Inc (Keller, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of PepsiCo Inc (Keller, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Golden Eagle of Arkansas Inc (Spivey, Patrick)
November 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Janssen on behalf of Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (Janssen, Daniel)
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary T. Eastburn on behalf of Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (Eastburn, Zachary)
November 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Oesch on behalf of Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (Oesch, Nathan)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 , #13 , #14 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice. Nathan J. Oesch, Zachary T. Eastburn, and Daniel Janssen are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/23/2020. (jbh)
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (King, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel Janssen. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3868702. Filed by Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (King, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Zachary T. Eastburn. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3868694. Filed by Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (King, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nathan J. Oesch. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3868686. Filed by Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (King, Andrew)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due 12/7/2020.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/18/2020. (amr)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Defendant Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (King, Andrew)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew King on behalf of Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc (King, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. PepsiCo Inc.'s answer is due 12/7/2020. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/12/2020. (amr)
November 11, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by PepsiCo Inc (Chiles, E.)
November 11, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Golden Eagle of Arkansas Inc. PepsiCo Inc served on 11/2/2020. (Spivey, Patrick)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Golden Eagle of Arkansas Inc. Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 11/2/2020. (Spivey, Patrick)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 SEALED EXHIBIT. (ajt)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff may file exhibit A under seal. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/29/2020. (amr)
October 29, 2020 Summons Issued as to PepsiCo Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, and Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc. c/o Corporate Creations Network, Inc. Summons returned to attorney for the plaintiff. (jap)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by Golden Eagle of Arkansas Inc. (ljb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Golden Eagle of Arkansas Inc. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT079494.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Eagle of Arkansas Inc v. Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo Inc
Represented By: Joshua Wade
Represented By: Geoffrey Sigler
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Daniel M. Janssen
Represented By: Zachary T. Eastburn
Represented By: Nathan Oesch
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Eagle of Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Sam Baber
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?