Cadet v. Dolgencorp LLC
Plaintiff: Marcus L Cadet
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC doing business as Dollar General
Case Number: 4:2020cv01334
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assualt,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint motion, Doc. #32 , granted as modified. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 12 June 2023. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/12/2023. (slb)
May 11, 2023 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Dispositive and Daubert Motions by Dolgencorp LLC (Chadick, Vincent)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint status report, Doc. #30 , appreciated. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/24/2023. (slb)
January 23, 2023 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Marcus L Cadet. (Porter, Austin)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint status report, Doc. #28 , overdue. Please file it. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2023. (slb)
October 4, 2022 Filing 28 AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/11/2023 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 3/10/2023. Motions due by 5/11/2023. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 11/9/2023. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/4/2022. (slb)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER mostly denying without prejudice #10 motion for summary judgment and granting false imprisonment. The parties either need to do more discovery or provide the Court more of the record already compiled. Time will be provided for this clean-up. Then we will have another round of potentially dispositive motions, so the Court can decide whether any claims need a trial. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/4/2022. (kdr)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The Court regrets, and apologizes for, its delay in considering the long ripe motion for summary judgment. Other matters have pressed. The Final Scheduling Order, Doc. #6 , is suspended. The 3 October 2022 trial is canceled. This case is not trial ready. The Court is working on the potentially dispositive motion. My tentative conclusion is that one claim fails and a more complete record is needed to evaluate the other claims. An Order will follow soon. The motion in limine, Doc. #21 , is denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/13/2022. (slb)
September 1, 2022 Filing 25 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET Plaintiff's Pre-Trial Conference Information Sheet by Marcus L Cadet. (Porter, Austin)
September 1, 2022 Filing 24 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Dolgencorp LLC. (Dixon, Andrew)
August 17, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Brief In Response to Defendant's Motion In Limine filed by Marcus L Cadet. (Porter, Austin)
August 3, 2022 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 Motion in Limine filed by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Deposition of Marcus Cadet, Excerpted))(Chadick, Vincent)
August 3, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION in Limine by Dolgencorp LLC (Chadick, Vincent)
May 2, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Deposition of Hope Curd, Excerpted))(Chadick, Vincent)
April 25, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #19 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #17 Response. (jak)
April 24, 2022 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 Response filed by Marcus L Cadet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Porter, Austin) (Docket text modified on 4/25/2022 to correct the linkage) (jak)
April 24, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #11 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1), Plaintiff's Response to the Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by Marcus L Cadet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Porter, Austin)
April 24, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response to the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marcus L Cadet. (Porter, Austin)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER:Unopposed motion, Doc. #15 , granted. Response due by 25 April 2022. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/18/2022. (slb)
April 18, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage to #10 Motion for Summary Judgment as indicated on the document. (kbc)
April 17, 2022 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #10 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Marcus L Cadet (Porter, Austin) Docket entry modified on 4/18/2022 to establish linkage. (kbc)
April 5, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Dolgencorp LLC (Chadick, Vincent)
April 5, 2022 Filing 13 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #2 Answer notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
April 4, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dolgencorp LLC. (Chadick, Vincent)
April 4, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #10 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Copy of Declaration of Authenticity of Rodney Mercer), #2 Exhibit B (Grant Co. Sheriff's Office Incident Report))(Chadick, Vincent)
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dolgencorp LLC (Chadick, Vincent)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER:Plaintiff's status report, Doc. #8 , appreciated. The Court notes the mutual conflict with the trial date. This case is slightly older than Hinton so this case will proceed to trial first, if both cases are ready. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/16/2021. (slb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Status Report by Marcus L Cadet. (Porter, Austin)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: There's been no activity on the docket for more than 180 days. The Court assumes the parties are making progress pursuant to the Final Scheduling Order. But if the case is not on track, file a short joint report explaining any problem by 19 October 2021. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/2021. (slb)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/3/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 2/3/2022. Motions due by 4/4/2022. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 9/1/2022. Signed at the direction of the Court on 2/9/2021. (slb)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Dolgencorp LLC. (Chadick, Vincent)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Steven Dixon on behalf of Dolgencorp LLC (Dixon, Andrew)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/8/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/23/2020. (slb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dolgencorp LLC.(Chadick, Vincent)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dolgencorp LLC filed by Marcus L Cadet. Fee $400 received. Receipt Number LIT079750. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadet v. Dolgencorp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus L Cadet
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC doing business as Dollar General
Represented By: Andrew Steven Dixon
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: Andrew S. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?