Jones v. Mapco Express Inc
Plaintiff: Roberta Jones
Defendant: Mapco Express Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv01481
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Marlin on behalf of Roberta Jones (Marlin, Russell)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/19/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2022 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the court on 1/5/2021. (slb)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mapco Express Inc.(Fairley, John)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Carter Fairley on behalf of Mapco Express Inc (Fairley, John)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mapco Express Inc, filed by Roberta Jones. (jbh)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mapco Express Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-20-06899. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT080189. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Mapco Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Jones
Represented By: Cheston Wright
Represented By: Russell D. Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapco Express Inc
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?