Whitworth v. Kling et al
Plaintiff: Katie Whitworth
Defendant: Bryant, City of and Mark Kling
Case Number: 4:2021cv00025
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/25/2022at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Motions to Amend and Join Other Parties due by 10/27/2021; Discovery due by 11/26/2021; Motions due by 12/27/2021; Status Report due by 12/27/2021; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 3/25/2022. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/1/2021. (hml)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Katie Whitworth. Joint 26(f) Report (Sutter, Luther)
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Denise Gibson on behalf of Bryant, City of, Mark Kling (Gibson, Gabrielle)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/31/2021 and Jury Trial set for 4/25/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/11/2021. (hml)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #8 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (jak)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styed case because Luther Sutter is on her recusal list. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/8/2021. (ljb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Mark Kling. (ljb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Bryant, City of. (ljb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Katie Whitworth. (ljb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mark Kling. (ljb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mark Kling filed by Katie Whitworth. (ljb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Mark Kling. (ljb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mark Kling from Saline County Circuit Court, Case Number 63CV-20-531-2. Fee of $402 paid, Receipt #LIT080436. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitworth v. Kling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Whitworth
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant, City of
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Caudle
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kling
Represented By: Jason James Campbell
Represented By: Russell Allen Wood
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?