Hall v. Turn Key Health Clinics LLC
Plaintiff: Carlos Hall, Sr
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics LLC, Absalom Tilley and Hannah Weatherly
Case Number: 4:2021cv00112
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 24 Second MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Sutter, Luther)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/26/2021. (rmg)
March 26, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Carlos Hall, Sr (Gillham, Lucien)
March 25, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Hall, Sr. Hannah Weatherly served on 3/17/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
March 25, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Hall, Sr. Absalom Tilley served on 3/16/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
March 24, 2021 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 Motion to Dismiss Hannah Weatherly and filed by Absalom Tilley. (Wankum, Mark)
March 24, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Hannah Weatherly and by Absalom Tilley (Wankum, Mark)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Hannah Weatherly.(Wankum, Mark)
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Absalom Tilley.(Wankum, Mark)
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC.(Wankum, Mark)
March 12, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (Wankum, Mark)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC (Wankum, Mark)
March 10, 2021 Summons Issued as to Absalom Tilley, Hannah Weatherly and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/4/2021. (rmg)
March 2, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document is filed "against all Defendants". (thd)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carlos Hall, Sr. (Sutter, Luther)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants, filed by Carlos Hall, Sr(Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 3/2/2021 to indicate the document is filed against all Defendants.) (thd).
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Carlos Hall, Sr (Gillham, Lucien)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/22/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/5/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/8/2022 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 2/12/2021. (rmg)
February 12, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filer to Turn Key Health Clinics LLC as indicated on the document. (kbc)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (kdr)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC identifying Corporate Parent TCSCFI TK LLC for Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (kdr)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (kdr) Docket text modified on 2/12/2021 to correct the party filer. (kbc)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (kdr)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC.(kdr)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Turn Key Health Clinics LLC, filed by Carlos Hall, Sr.(kdr)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-21-624. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT080863. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Turn Key Health Clinics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absalom Tilley
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Weatherly
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Hall, Sr
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?