Richardson v. Crain Ford of Little Rock LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dane Richardson
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance and Crain Ford of Little Rock LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00126
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Capital One's motion to dismiss; dismissing without prejudice Richardson's claims against Capital One; and allowing Plaintiff leave to amend. Amended complaint due by 04/16/2021. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 03/24/2021. (ajt)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dane Richardson. (Mays, Richard)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capital One Auto Finance. (Meyer, Christopher)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Capital One Auto Finance (Meyer, Christopher)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION filed by Dane Richardson with Jury Demand against All Defendants.(ajt)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Capital One Auto Finance from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-20-6803. Fee $402 paid, receipt number LIT080935. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Crain Ford of Little Rock LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane Richardson
Represented By: Richard L. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crain Ford of Little Rock LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?