Cagle v. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC
Plaintiff: Alanna M Cagle
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00155
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 parties' joint motion to stay and compel arbitration; and staying this case, pending completion of the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/9/2021. (kdr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint and Compel Arbitration by Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate Claims)(Powell, Meredith)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 4/16/2021. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/1/2021. (rmg)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC (Powell, Meredith)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Autumn Powell on behalf of Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC (Powell, Meredith)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Falasco on behalf of Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC (Falasco, Joseph)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Alanna M Cagle. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC served on 3/11/2021. (Campbell, Sheila)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC, filed by Alanna M Cagle. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT081018. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cagle v. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC
Represented By: Meredith Autumn Powell
Represented By: Joseph R. Falasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alanna M Cagle
Represented By: Sheila F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?