Humphrey v. Payton
Plaintiff: Marion Andrew Humphrey, Jr
Defendant: Steven Payton
Case Number: 4:2021cv00194
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/6/2021 and Jury Trial set for 6/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/14/2021. (hml)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Steven Payton.(Bird, William)
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Bird, III on behalf of Steven Payton (Bird, William)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marion Andrew Humphrey, Jr. Steven Payton served on 3/22/2021. (fjg)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Noel. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/12/2021. (kla)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc E. Betinsky. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/12/2021. (kla)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Bennett. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/12/2021. (kla)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Andrew J. Noel. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3967076. Filed by Marion Andrew Humphrey, Jr (Neal, Emily)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Marc E. Betinsky. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3967068. Filed by Marion Andrew Humphrey, Jr (Neal, Emily)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert Bennett. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3967066. Filed by Marion Andrew Humphrey, Jr (Neal, Emily)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Steven Payton filed by Marion Andrew Humphrey, Jr. (Fee $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT081229.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Andrew Humphrey, Jr
Represented By: William Conner Eldridge, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew J. Noel
Represented By: Emily A. Neal
Represented By: Robert Bennett
Represented By: Marc E. Betinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Payton
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?