Warner v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Keith Warner
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00270
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Keith Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EAJA reply time)(Olinsky, Howard)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 motion; and extending to 01/31/2023, Mr. Warner's deadline to reply to Acting Commissioner Kijakazi's response to Mr. Warner's motion for attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 01/17/2023. (llg)
January 17, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE by Keith Warner re #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition Notice of Consent (Olinsky, Howard)
January 16, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition by Keith Warner (Olinsky, Howard)
January 10, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Social Security Administration. (Selby, Jennifer)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 motion for extension of time to respond; and extending to 1/10/2023, Acting Commissioner Kijakazi's deadline to respond to Mr. Warner's #20 motion for attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/28/2022. (jbh)
December 28, 2022 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act by Social Security Administration (Selby, Jennifer)
December 28, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J. Selby on behalf of Social Security Administration (Selby, Jennifer)
December 14, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #20 MOTION for Attorney Fees. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the proposed order was filed as an attachment to docket entry #20 in error. (jak)
December 13, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #20 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Keith Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees, #2 Exhibit B- CPI Table, #3 Exhibit C- All Professional Time, #4 Exhibit D- Attorney Time, #5 Exhibit E- Paralegal Time, #6 Exhibit F- Expenses, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 Certificate of Service)(Olinsky, Howard)
December 13, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Keith Warner. (Olinsky, Howard) (Docket text modified on 12/14/2022 to indicate the proposed order was filed as an attachment in error)(jak)
September 20, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #18 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "ORDER adopting #17 Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; reversing the final decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration; and remanding this case for further proceedings" as stated on the Order. (jak)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the #18 Order entered on this date, the final decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is reversed, and this case is remanded for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/19/2022. (jbh)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting #17 Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; reversing the final decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration; and remanding this case for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/19/2022. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 9/20/2022 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
May 4, 2022 Filing 17 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending the Commissioner's decision be reversed and the case be remanded for further review. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 05/04/2022. (llg)
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 DEFENDANT'S BRIEF filed by Social Security Administration. (McGeehan, Una)
December 10, 2021 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Keith Warner. Defendant Brief due by 1/21/2022 (Olinsky, Howard)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 plaintiff's unopposed motion for additional time in which to file his brief; and directing him to submit his response on or before 12/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/18/2021. (llg)
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Keith Warner (Olinsky, Howard)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 Administrative Transcript. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to "Supplemental Transcript" based on the attached correspondence. (kbc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff Brief due by 10/22/2021. Defendant Brief due within 42 days of the day Plaintiff's Brief is served. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/10/2021. (cfd)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re #9 Administrative Transcript (Social Security), filed by Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(McCord, Stacey) Docket text modified on 9/13/2021 to correct description. (kbc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings filed by Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment)(McCord, Stacey)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Social Security Administration.(McGeehan, Una)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 defendant's unopposed motion for additional time in which to file a response and the administrative record; and directing defendant to submit his response on or before 09/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 07/06/2021. (ajt) (Docket text modified on 7/8/2021 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(McGeehan, Una)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Una McGeehan on behalf of Social Security Administration (McGeehan, Una)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Warner. Social Security Administration served on 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavits of Mailing)(Olinsky, Howard)
April 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (ljb)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 application to proceed in forma pauperis. The applicant may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/12/2021. (ljb)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Keith Warner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keith Warner. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Warner
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Jennifer J. Selby
Represented By: Una McGeehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?