Brisco v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Courtney Brisco
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 4:2021cv00307
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 motion for extension of time to file answer. Sun Life may file an answer or otherwise respond to Ms. Brisco's complaint up to and including 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/11/2021. (jbh)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Pautler on behalf of Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Pautler, Richard)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Pautler, Richard)
June 1, 2021 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Kristine G. Baker. Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/1/2021. (ajt)
May 10, 2021 Summons Issued as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada and returned to counsel for plaintiff. (jap)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to allow J. Anthony Vessel to appear pro hac vice, consent to designation, and request to electronically receive notices of electronic filing. Fee of $100 paid; receipt number LIT081689. Filed by Daniel Allen Webb. (jbh)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, filed by Courtney Brisco. No summons issued. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT081689.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brisco v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Brisco
Represented By: Marc S. Whitehead
Represented By: J. Anthony Vessel
Represented By: Britney Heath McDonald
Represented By: Daniel Allen Webb
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Richard J. Pautler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?