Hudson v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stacey Hudson
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00310
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/1/2021. (kbc)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Campbell, Jason)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #44 Remand to State Court,, filed by Stacey Hudson. (Chaney, Sterling)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Stacey Hudson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Discovery Order (October 9, 2018), #3 Exhibit C - Pl's Mot Extension to Provide Expert Disclosures (June 23, 2020), #4 Exhibit D - Pl's Mot Extension to Reply to Defs Response to Pls Mot for Extension to Provide Expert Disclosures (July 13, 2020), #5 Exhibit E - Letter dated February 18, 2021 from Hudson to Allstate, #6 Exhibit F - Email from Allstate acknowledging Hudson's correspondence of February 18, 2021, #7 Exhibit G - Letter dated March 8, 2021 from Hudson to Allstate)(Chaney, Sterling)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/6/2021 and Jury Trial set for 7/18/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/19/2021. (hml)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION #20 Response and #40 Motion. CORRECTION: The docket entries were modified to correct the file date to 4/15/2021 as indicated on the documents. (kbc)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE to #42 ALLSTATE'S MOTION to Strike #6 First Amended Complaint filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM MOTION to Strike #6 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DEFENDANT'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DEFENDANT'S MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg) Docket entry modified on 4/19/2021 to correct file date. (kbc)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY to Defendant's Response to #37 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Expert Disclosures filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE to #37 PLAINTIFFS' BELATED MOTION for Extension of Expert Disclosure filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Expert Disclosures by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE to #30 DEFENDANT'S MOTION to Compel Mediation with Integrated Brief in Support filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE to #31 DEFENDANT'S MOTION in Limine to Exclude Dr. Ralph Scott, PH.D filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to #26 DEFENDANT'S MOTION for Sanctions filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to Plaintiffs' Response to #25 DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony and Report of Tanya Owen, Plaintiffs' Vocational Expert filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #28 PLAINTIFFS' Response to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM MOTION in Limine to Exclude Ralph Scott, PH.D by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM MOTION to Compel Mediation by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE #25 DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED MEMORANDUM MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony and Report of Dr. Tanya Owen filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE to #26 DEFENDANT'S MOTION for Sanctions filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #26 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DEFENDANT'S MOTION for Sanctions by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED MEMORANDUM MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony and Report of Tanya Owen, Plaintiffs' Vocational Expert by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Pulaski County Circuit Court Judge on 10/09/2018. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PLAINTIFFS' REPLY in Support of #19 PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET of MOTIONS in Limine and REQUEST for Judicial Notice filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE to #19 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION in Limine and OBJECTION to Request for Judicial Notice as to Life Expectancy filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE to #18 DEFENDANT'S MOTION in Limine to Exclude Witnesses Disclosed on Last Day of Discovery filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE to #16 DEFENDANT'S MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony and Report of Tanya Owen, Plaintiffs' Vocational Expert filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg) Docket entry modified on 4/19/2021 to correct file date. (kbc)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET of MOTIONS in Limine and REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM MOTION in Limine to Exclude Witnesses Disclosed on Last Day of Discovery by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #16 Motion in Limine Regarding Testimony and Report of Tanya Owen, Plaintiffs' Vocational Expert filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DEFENDANT'S MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony and Report of Tanya Owen, Plaintiffs' Vocational Expert by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PLAINTIFFS' REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Compel and PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE to Defendant's Protective Order filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Exclude Expert Witnesses filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Compel and DEFENDANT'S MOTION for Protective Order filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Plaintiffs' #11 Motion to Exclude Defendant's Retained Experts, Dr. Joe Crow & Brian Boggess filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION to Exclude Expert Witnesses, Dr. Joe Crow and Brian Boggess by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #9 Plaintiffs' First Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION to Compel Discovery by Stacey Hudson. (llg)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company. (ljb)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allstate Insurance Company filed by Stacey Hudson. (ljb)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company. (ljb)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allstate Insurance Company filed by Stacey and Travis Hudson. (ljb)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation. (ljb)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATION by Allstate Insurance Company. (ljb)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-17-4496. Fee of $402 paid, Receipt #LIT081701. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Hudson
Represented By: Sterling Taylor Chaney
Represented By: Donald P. Chaney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?