Crow Holdings LP v. Crow Group Inc
Plaintiff: Crow Holdings LP
Defendant: Crow Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00363
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Crow Group Inc. (Norment, Rashauna)
June 10, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Crow Holdings LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Shults, Steven)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/4/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/17/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/28/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/1/2021. (ljb)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Crow Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Crow Holdings TSDR, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Crow Holdings Partners TSDR, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 -Crow Holdings Industrial TSDR, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 -Crow Holdings Office TSDR, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5-Trammell Crow Residential TSDR, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6-Trammell Crow TSDR, #7 Supplement Domond v PeopleNetwork)(Norment, Rashauna)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Crow Group Inc (Norment, Rashauna)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rashauna A. Norment on behalf of Crow Group Inc (Norment, Rashauna)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 , #5 , and #6 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice by A. Tucker Davison, Charles E. Phipps, and Robert E. Nail. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/17/2021. (ljb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert E. Nail. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4009230. Filed by Crow Holdings LP (Shults, Steven)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Charles E. Phipps. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4009225. Filed by Crow Holdings LP (Shults, Steven)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by A. Tucker Davison. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4009219. Filed by Crow Holdings LP (Shults, Steven)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Exhibits and Summons , filed by Crow Holdings LP. Crow Group Inc served on 5/6/2021. (Shults, Steven)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark submitted by the Clerk's Office to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on 5/10/2021. (cdw)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Crow Group Inc, filed by Crow Holdings LP. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT081973. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow Holdings LP v. Crow Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crow Holdings LP
Represented By: Peter R. Shults
Represented By: Charles E. Phipps
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: Robert E. Nail
Represented By: A. Tucker Davison
Represented By: Tucker Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crow Group Inc
Represented By: Rashauna A. Norment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?