Domtar AW LLC v. Landmark American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Domtar AW LLC
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company, Stephen L Lindsay and Power Specialists Assoc Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00409
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Power Specialists Assoc Inc (Davis, Frederick)
July 9, 2021 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/7/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/21/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 7/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/09/2021. (tmw)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Landmark American Insurance Company (Knippen, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Landmark American Insurance Company.(Knippen, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Power Specialists Assoc Inc.(Davis, Frederick)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 , #10 motions for extension of time. All defendants may file any response to Domtar's complaint up to and including 7/8/2021. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/29/2021. (jbh)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Landmark American Insurance Company (Knippen, Michael)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Power Specialists Assoc Inc (Davis, Frederick)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Knippen on behalf of Landmark American Insurance Company (Knippen, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process as to Stephen L. Lindsay by Domtar AW LLC. (Stallings, Mark)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process as to Landmark American Insurance Company by Domtar AW LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stallings, Mark)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process as to Power Specialists Assoc., Inc. by Domtar AW LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stallings, Mark)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant Lindsay's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stephen L Lindsay.(Zalasky, Richard)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Zalasky on behalf of Stephen L Lindsay (Zalasky, Richard)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Domtar AW LLC (Stallings, Mark)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Landmark American Insurance Company, Stephen L Lindsay, Power Specialists Assoc Inc, filed by Domtar AW LLC. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082127.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domtar AW LLC v. Landmark American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael S. Knippen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L Lindsay
Represented By: Richard John Zalasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Specialists Assoc Inc
Represented By: Frederick Hart Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domtar AW LLC
Represented By: Joseph Cotten Cunningham
Represented By: Mark Evan Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?