Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation v. TJC Mortgage Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation and Rock Mortgage
Defendant: TJC Mortgage Inc, Jamie Pearson, Rose Rauch, Elizabeth White, Ellen Wester, Kristina Kemp, Hayley Sansing, Cindy Johns, MortgageRight, Anna Leigh DeLaire and Devin McCullough
Case Number: 4:2021cv00436
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama filed by Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Affidavit of Scott McElmurry)(Shannon, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/2/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/16/2021; Bench Trial set for 11/7/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/6/2021. (ljb)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the parties' #15 joint motion to dismiss separate defendant, Cindy Johns with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 06/30/2021. (llg)
June 29, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation's Claims Against Cindy Johns With Prejudice by Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation (Shannon, Michael)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 motion for extension of time to file response.Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/22/2021.(gmh)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, #12 Brief in Support, by Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation (Shannon, Michael)
June 10, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama filed by Kristina Kemp, Devin McCullough, Jamie Pearson, Rose Rauch, Hayley Sansing, TJC Mortgage Inc, Ellen Wester, Elizabeth White. (Grice, Randy)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama by Kristina Kemp, Devin McCullough, Jamie Pearson, Rose Rauch, Hayley Sansing, TJC Mortgage Inc, Ellen Wester, Elizabeth White (Grice, Randy)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time. Response to #3 motion to dismiss due by 6/22/2021. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/9/2021. (ljb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Failure to State a Claim, #4 Brief in Support by Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation (Shannon, Michael)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to file response.Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/28/2021.(gmh)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint by Anna Leigh DeLaire (Crass, Kevin)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time to file response.Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/26/2021.(gmh)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time by Kristina Kemp, Devin McCullough, Jamie Pearson, Rose Rauch, Hayley Sansing, TJC Mortgage Inc, Ellen Wester, Elizabeth White (Grice, Randy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Cindy Johns. (Applegate, Ryan)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Failure to State a Claim by Cindy Johns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Cindy Johns, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Applegate, Ryan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation. (jbh)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kristina Kemp, Devin McCullough, Jamie Pearson, Rose Rauch, Hayley Sansing, TJC Mortgage Inc, Ellen Wester, Elizabeth White from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-21-02317. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT082182. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation v. TJC Mortgage Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Little Rock Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Mary Tipton Thalheimer
Represented By: David B. Vandergriff
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock Mortgage
Represented By: Mary Tipton Thalheimer
Represented By: David B. Vandergriff
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJC Mortgage Inc
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott Kamins
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Pearson
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott Kamins
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Rauch
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott Kamins
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth White
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott Kamins
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Wester
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott Kamins
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Kemp
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott Kamins
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayley Sansing
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott Kamins
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Johns
Represented By: Ryan J. Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MortgageRight
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott Kamins
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Leigh DeLaire
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin McCullough
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott Kamins
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?