Reynolds et al v. Blackberry Farm LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mark Reynolds and Susan Reynolds
Defendant: Blackberry Farm LLC, Mikey's Motors LLC and Textron Specialized Vehicles doing business as E-Z Go
Case Number: 4:2021cv00451
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 26 E-MAIL received from U.S. District Court Eastern District of Tennessee, confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 3:21-cv-00293. (jak)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER given where this case needs to be litigated, the three motions to dismiss - #15 & #17 in case 4:21-cv-451 DPM and 10 in 4:21-cv-459 DPM - are denied without prejudice as moot. #23 Motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint in 4:21-cv-451 DPM and 16 in 4:21-cv-459 DPM - are granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motions due by 8/25/2021. The pending motions, related filings, and further thoughts from the parties confirm that the interest of justice will be best served by transferring these companion cases to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. Motions to transfer #19 in 4:21-cv-451 DPM and 12 in 4:21-cv-459 DPM are granted. Both cases are transferred to that district. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/11/2021. (jak)
August 11, 2021 Docket Note: Pursuant to #25 Order, this case was electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee on this date.(jak)
August 9, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Poynter, Scott)
August 5, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Blackberry Farm LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1)(Joy, Justin)
August 5, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin N. Joy on behalf of Blackberry Farm LLC (Joy, Justin)
August 3, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #19 RESPONSE in Opposition and MOTION to Transfer by Textron Specialized Vehicles (Drennon, Baxter) (Docket text modified on 8/3/2021 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
August 3, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #19 Response and #21 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #19 was modified to correct the filing event as "Response and Motion to Transfer" to show as a pending motion on the docket as marked on the document. The docket text for docket entry #21 was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "RESPONSE to #19 RESPONSE in Opposition and MOTION to Transfer by Textron Specialized Vehicles" as marked on the document. (jak)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The pending motions and related filings in these companion cases suggest the parties agree that transferring both actions to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee would make good sense. If any party wishes to be heard further on this issue, the Court would appreciate an expedited response by 08/03/2021. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 07/27/2021. (ajt)
July 26, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Motion to Dismiss and MOTION to Transfer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Poynter, Scott)(Docket entry modified on 8/3/2021 to correct the filing event)(jak)
July 26, 2021 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 Motion to Dismiss filed by Textron Specialized Vehicles. (Drennon, Baxter)
July 26, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Textron Specialized Vehicles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drennon, Baxter)
July 26, 2021 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mikey's Motors LLC. (mdo)
July 26, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Mikey's Motors LLC (mdo)
July 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Service on Mikeys Motors L.L.C. (Holland, Philip)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, Doc. #12 , denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. The Court directs the Clerk to return the $100 application fee to counsel. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/2021. (slb)
June 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ellis A. Sharp filed by Mikey's Motors LLC. Fee $100 received, receipt number LIT082671. (mdo)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #10 Waiver of Service Executed lacks a correct case number (Local Rule 5.5(a)). (jak)
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Blackberry Farm LLC by Susan Reynolds, Mark Reynolds. (Holland, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2021: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 6/21/2021)) (jak).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: A golf cart crash involving Arkansawyer families visiting a Tennessee resort has generated two lawsuits. The lawyers in each case are the same. Common questions of fact and law exist. In their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) reports, the parties should address whether consolidation or coordination would be most useful. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/15/2021. (jak)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Textron Specialized Vehicles by Susan Reynolds, Mark Reynolds. (Holland, Philip)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Everett Clarke Tucker, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tucker, Everett)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Notice, Doc. #5 , appreciated. Withdrawn motion, Doc. #2 , denied as moot. The Court applauds the parties' cooperation. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/28/2021. (slb)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of Motion for Temporary Order (Poynter, Scott)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 26 May 2021 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. via telephone: The Court heard from counsel on the pending motion for immediate and temporary order, Doc. 2. A joint proposal from counsel is due by Friday, 28 May 2021. An Order will follow. (For Plaintiffs: Scott Poynter; For Defendants: Kristina Reliford, Baxter Drennon, and Mitchell Panter; and Court Reporter Kathy Maloney). (slb)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #2 MOTION for Immediate and Temporary Order filed by Susan Reynolds, Mark Reynolds. (ajt)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE AND TEMPORARY ORDER by Mark Reynolds, Susan Reynolds. (ajt)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Blackberry Farm LLC, Mikey's Motors LLC, Textron Specialized Vehicles filed by Susan Reynolds, Mark Reynolds. (Fee $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082245.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds et al v. Blackberry Farm LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Reynolds
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Philip Daniel Holland
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Reynolds
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Philip Daniel Holland
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackberry Farm LLC
Represented By: Justin N. Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikey's Motors LLC
Represented By: Ellis A. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Specialized Vehicles doing business as E-Z Go
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?