Colvert Verot v. Colvert
Plaintiff: Claire Lise Colvert Verot
Defendant: Joshua David Colvert
Case Number: 4:2021cv00510
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 VOLUNTARY RETURN ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 08/06/2021. (llg)
August 6, 2021 Filing 28 RECEIPT for Exhibits by Claire Lise Colvert Verot (cdw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 27 WITNESS and EXHIBIT LIST by Joshua David Colvert(cdw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 26 EXHIBIT LIST by Claire Lise Colvert Verot (cdw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 25 WITNESS LIST by Claire Lise Colvert Verot (cdw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.: BENCH TRIAL (DAY 2) held on Friday, 8/6/2021. Parties announce settlement. Terms of settlement recited on the record. Voluntary Return Order signed by the Court. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Suzanne McKennon) (cdw)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #15 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is denied for the reasons stated on the record on August 5, 2021. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/6/2021. (dpb)
August 6, 2021 Docket Note: Passports for Claire Lisa Verot, Joshua David Colvert, and two minor children returned pursuant to direction from the Court. (cmn)
August 5, 2021 Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.: BENCH TRIAL (DAY 1) held on Thursday, 8/5/2021. Opening statements by counsel. Plaintiff's proof begins. Richard Min, Megan Wells, Tess Stewart present for plaintiff; Jim Wyatt, Betty Hardy present for defendant; Interpreter Steven Mines present. (Court Reporter Suzanne McKennon) (cdw)
August 4, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Petitioner's Motion for Determination of Swiss Law or For Judicial Notice and Motion for Summary Judgment with Incorporated Brief filed by Joshua David Colvert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit English - PILA, #2 Exhibit French - PILA, #3 Exhibit Saline County Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit Divorce Filing - Sion (Part1), #5 Exhibit Divorce Filing - Sion (Part2), #6 Exhibit Aff of Joshua Colvert)(Wyatt, James)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR VISITATION directing the agreed visitation to begin at 1:30 pm today to continue through 6pm on Wednesday, 8/4; directing the Clerk's office to accept and maintain the passports of the parties and the two children in the sealed vault pending further order of the Court; and directing parties to keep the children in the jurisdiction of the Eastern District of Arkansas pending Thursday's hearing. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/2/2021. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 8/3/2021 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
August 2, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite , Emergency MOTION to Enforce Visitation Agreement and Incorporated Brief () by Claire Lise Colvert Verot (Wells, Megan)
August 2, 2021 Docket Note: Passports received from Claire Lisa Verot, Joshua David Colvert, and two minor children to be maintained in the sealed vault pending further order of the Court pursuant to #20 Order. (cmn)
July 23, 2021 Filing 18 TRIAL BRIEF by Claire Lise Colvert Verot(Min, Richard)
July 23, 2021 Filing 17 TRIAL BRIEF by Joshua David Colvert(Wyatt, James)
July 22, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event as "STATEMENT OF FACTS re #15 Motion for Summary Judgment" as marked on the document. (jak)
July 21, 2021 Filing 16 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #15 Motion for Summary Judgment by Claire Lise Colvert Verot (Wells, Megan) (Docket entry modified on 7/22/2021 to correct the filing event)(jak)
July 21, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Petitioner's Motion for Determination of Swiss Law or For Judicial Notice and Motion for Summary Judgment with Incorporated Brief by Claire Lise Colvert Verot (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wells, Megan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Joshua David Colvert.(Wyatt, James)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is schedule for an evidentiary hearing commencing at 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, 08/05/2021, in Little Rock Courtroom #4A. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/01/2021. (ajt)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.: SHOW CAUSE Hearing held on 6/23/2021; MOTION to Expedite Proceedings Pursuant to Hague Convention #8 is granted in part; Parties agree to waive the six (6) week deadline set by the Hague Convention. The deadline for Respondent to file responsive pleadings is July 9, 2021; the deadline to submit and exchange pretrial briefs, exhibit lists, witness lists, and stipulations is July 23, 2021. BENCH TRIAL set THURSDAY, AUGUST 5, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. (Counsel for Plaintiff: Richard Min, Tess Stewart, Megan Wells; Counsel for Defendant: James Wyatt, Betty Hardy; Court Reporter: Karen Dellinger.) (kog)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of All filings to date Affidavit of Service via Certified Mail, filed by Claire Lise Colvert Verot. Joshua David Colvert served on 6/19/2021. (Stewart, Tess)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service Affidavit of Personal Service, filed by Claire Lise Colvert Verot. Joshua David Colvert served on 6/21/2021. (Stewart, Tess)
June 18, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Order. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the date filed as 6/17/2021 as indicated by the document. (cmn)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Respondent, Joshua David Colvert, or his attorneys, show cause before this Court, on 06/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. or as soon thereafter as counsel can be heard, to discuss scheduling a final hearing and additional matters necessary for the Court to determine whether an Order should be entered granting Petitioner relief; and ordering that personal service of a copy of this Order, together with copies of the papers upon which it was brought on Respondent on or before 06/21/2021 be deemed sufficient. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 06/17/2021. (ajt) (Docket entry modified on 6/18/2021 to correct the date filed.)(cmn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Proceedings Pursuant to Hague Convention by Claire Lise Colvert Verot (Stewart, Tess)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Richard Min is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 06/17/2021. (ajt)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Relief. Petitioner may file the redacted version of her motion to expedite. Petitioner is directed to submit the redacted version to the Clerk for filing. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/17/2021. (amr)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Relief File Redacted Version of Attached Motion to Expedite by Claire Lise Colvert Verot (Stewart, Tess)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Richard Min. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4036761. Filed by Claire Lise Colvert Verot (Stewart, Tess)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SEAL PETITION FOR RETURN OF CHILDREN TO PETITIONER AND EXHIBITS THERETO granting Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Petition for Return of Children to Petitioner and Exhibits thereto. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 06/15/2021. (llg) (Docket text modified on 6/16/2021 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak) (cmn).
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 PETITIONER'S MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Petition for Return of Children to Petitioner and Exhibits Thereto by Claire Lise Colvert Verot. (llg) (cmn).
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 SEALED PETITION. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082499.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (llg) (Docket text modified on 6/16/2021 to indicate the document is filed under seal.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colvert Verot v. Colvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Lise Colvert Verot
Represented By: Tess E. Stewart
Represented By: Richard Min
Represented By: Megan L Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua David Colvert
Represented By: James Winfield Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?