Federal Trade Commission et al v. BINT Operations LLC et al
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas, Federal Trade Commission and Arkansas, State of
Defendant: Marlon DeAndre Moore, Marlon DeAndre Maiden, BINT Operations LLC and LaShonda Moore
Case Number: 4:2021cv00518
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of the FTC's Second Motion to Strike Defendants Improper Exhibits Offered in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Document Reply in Support of FTC's Second Motion to Strike)(LeJeune, Anne)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE to Motion re #103 Second MOTION to Strike Defendants' Improper Exhibits Offered in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Bryan, Justin)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPLY to Response to Motion re #89 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Stacie Bosley, PH.D. filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Bryan, Justin)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #103 Motion to Strike Second Motion to Strike Defendants' Improper Exhibits Offered in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LeJeune, Anne)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Second MOTION to Strike Defendants' Improper Exhibits Offered in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment by Federal Trade Commission (LeJeune, Anne)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Stacie Bosley, PH.D. filed by Arkansas, State of. (Epperson, Jason)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Stacie Bosley, PH.D. filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STATUS REPORT by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit G-1)(LeJeune, Anne)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STATUS REPORT by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Bryan, Justin)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ADDENDUM filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore to #96 Response in Opposition to Motion,. Exhibits to Defendants Omnibus Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Bryan, Justin)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #96 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Bryan, Justin)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Omnibus Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Bryan, Justin)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STATUS REPORT by Arkansas, State of. (Epperson, Jason)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #80 plaintiffs' motion for continuance and to continue the trial date; removing this case from the 5/22/2023, trial calendar and suspending all #42 unexpired pre-trial deadlines; granting #82 defendants' motion to file a belated response; defendants shall have 7 days from the entry of this Order to file a response; Plaintiff's shall have 7 days after the date defendants' response is filed to file a reply, should plaintiffs choose to do so; and ordering parties to file separate status updates within 7 days of the entry of this Order. The Court will set new pre-trial deadlines, extended by no less than 120 days, and a new trial date by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/24/2023. (kdr)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #92 Motion to Strike Exhibit 5, Doc. 85-5 filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(LeJeune, Anne)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Strike #85 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1), Exhibit 5, Doc. 85-5 by Federal Trade Commission (LeJeune, Anne)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission (Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Notice under Federal Rules of Evidence 807 and 902(11)) (Tepfer, Reid)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Stacie Bosley, PH.D. by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore (Bryan, Justin)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE OPPOSITON TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS OUT OF TIME filed by Arkansas, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Epperson, Jason)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore re #80 MOTION to Extend Time (Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Continue Trial Date and Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND EXTEND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES (Bryan, Justin)
February 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE OPPOSITON TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS OUT OF TIME filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #84 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Bryan, Justin)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS OMNIBUS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Bryan, Justin)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 MOTION to Extend Time (Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Continue Trial Date and Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines) filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Bryan, Justin)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE OPPOSITON TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS OUT OF TIME by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore (Bryan, Justin)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re #80 MOTION to Extend Time (Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Continue Trial Date and Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines), #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Plaintiffs' Notice of Defendants' Failure to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment and Supplement in Support of Motion to Continue Trial Date and Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines) (Tepfer, Reid)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Extend Time (Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Continue Trial Date and Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines) by Federal Trade Commission (Tepfer, Reid)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SEALED DOCUMENT. (kth)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #75 motion to seal. The State of Arkansas may file Exhibit 20 to its motion for summary judgment under seal. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/8/2023. (jbh)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 EXHIBITS [10 FTC-BINT 001624 produced in Native Format], [Exhibit 11 FTC-BINT 001765 produced in Native Format], [Exhibit 13 FTC-BINT 001625 produced Native Format], [Exhibit 14 FTC-BINT 001633 produced in Native Format] filed by Arkansas, State of to #72 Motion for Summary Judgment. Submitted conventionally and maintained in the Clerk's Office file. (jap)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Filing of Physical Exhibits in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Federal Trade Commission re #71 Statement of Facts #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment. [2 DVRs containing 30 video files identified in FTC's Table of Contents of Video Appendix with Table of Video Authentication and Foundation. Video Appendix: V-App 1-15-Disk 1 of 2, Video Appendix: V-App 16-30 Disk 2 of 2.(DVRs are maintained in the Clerk's Office file)] (jap)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 20 to Motion for Summary Judgment by Arkansas, State of (Epperson, Jason)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #72 Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, filed by Arkansas, State of. (Epperson, Jason)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #72 Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, filed by Arkansas, State of. (Epperson, Jason)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Arkansas, State of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Defendants BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, and Marlon Deandre Moore's First Amended Reponses to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions [and State of Arkansas] First Request for Admissions (dated September 1, 2022), #2 Exhibit 2- Defendant BINT Operations LLCs Responses to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions [and State of Arkansas] Second Request for Admissions (dated December 16, 2022), #3 Exhibit 3- Defendant LaShonda Moore's Responses to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions [and State of Arkansas] Second Request for Admissions (dated December 16, 2022), #4 Exhibit 4 - M. Moore Resp to FTCs 2d RFAs, #5 Exhibit 5- Marlon Rog Objections, #6 Exhibit 6 -Lashonda Rog obj, #7 Exhibit 7- Bint Ops rog obj, #8 Exhibit 8- BINT Privacy Statement, #9 Exhibit 9- BINT Transcript - Nia Smith, #10 Exhibit 10- Produced in Native Format - FTC-BINT 001624, #11 Exhibit 11- Produced in Native Format - FTC- BlNT 001765, #12 Exhibit 12- Decl. of Admin Darrion Coleman, #13 Exhibit 13- Produced in Native Format - FTC- BlNT 001625, #14 Exhibit 14- Produced in Native Format - FTC-BINT 001633, #15 Exhibit 15 - Plaintiff FTCs Expert Disclosure, #16 Exhibit 16-Dec. of AR Atty General Investigator S. Johnson, #17 Exhibit 17-Dec. of A. Frye, #18 Exhibit 18- Dec. of S. Dawson, #19 Exhibit 19- Dec. of B. Lewis)(Epperson, Jason)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #70 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents of Appendix of Evidence, #2 Appendix Vol. 1, #3 Appendix Vol. 2, #4 Appendix Vol. 3, #5 Table of Contents of Video Appendix)(Tepfer, Reid)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal Trade Commission (Tepfer, Reid)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 motion and relieving Ms. Land as counsel for the State in this matter. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/9/2023. (kdr)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Arkansas, State of (Land, Amanda)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION of Facts Regarding Defendant BINT Operations LLC by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LeJeune, Anne)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION CONCERNING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MARLON MOORE by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION CONCERNING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT LASHONDA MOORE by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION to Compel Defendant BINT Operations LLC to Respond to Interrogatories filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(LeJeune, Anne)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 motion for leave to file reply brief in support of #51 motion to compel defendant BINT Operations LLC to respond to interrogatories. Plaintiffs shall have seven days from the entry of this Order to file their reply brief. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/7/2022. (jbh)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/7/2022. (jbh)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of FTC's Motion to Compel BINT Operations LLC to Respond to Interrogatories #51 by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Document Reply Brief in Support of FTC's Motion to Compel BINT Operations LLC to Respond to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Reply Brief in Support of FTC's Motion to Compel BINT Operations LLC to Respond to Interrogatories)(LeJeune, Anne)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #56 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to "Reply Brief in Support" as indicated on the document and pursuant to instruction from chambers. (kbc)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bryan, Justin)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Compel Defendant BINT Operations LLC to Respond to Interrogatories filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Bryan, Justin)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #51 Motion to Compel filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bryan, Justin)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #45 Motion for Protective Order filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Bryan, Justin) Docket text modified on 10/11/2022 to correct description. (kbc)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Mosley-Day on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Mosley-Day, Serena)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tepfer, Reid)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by BINT Operations LLC (Bryan, Justin)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #51 Motion to Compel Defendant BINT Operations LLC to Respond to Interrogatories filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(LeJeune, Anne)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Compel Defendant BINT Operations LLC to Respond to Interrogatories by Federal Trade Commission (LeJeune, Anne)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by David Alex on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Alex, David)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne D. LeJeune on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (LeJeune, Anne)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Tepfer, Reid)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #35 Motion notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #45 Motion for Protective Order filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bryan, Justin)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Protective Order by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bryan, Justin)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 motion to substitute counsel; and directing the Clerk of Court to remove Shannon Halijan and David McCoy as counsel of record for the state. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/21/2022. (jbh)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Arkansas, State of (Epperson, Jason)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 5/22/2023 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 1/6/2023; Motions due by 1/27/2023; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 2/27/2023; Status Report due by 1/20/2023. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/14/2022. (tmw)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Allen Epperson on behalf of Arkansas, State of (Epperson, Jason)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Hecker shall appear as counsel of record for defendant. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/27/2022. (ldb)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kristin M. Hecker filed by All Defendants. Fee $100 receipt number LIT087114. (kth)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER partially granting #37 joint motion to extend deadlines and continue trial date; and suspending all current pre-trial deadlines. The Court will reset the trial date for Monday, 5/22/2023, and will set revised pre-trial deadlines by separate order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/18/2022. (jbh)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Continue Trial Date) by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Order)(Gallegos, Luis)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #30 the Godwin Counsel's motion to withdraw; denying as moot #33 defendants' motion to extend time; and granting #35 Mr. Bryan's motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendants. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/06/2022. (llg)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Justin N. Bryan filed by All Defendants. Fee $100 received. Receipt number LIT086640. (kth)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Defendants' BINT Operations LLC ("BINT"), LaShonda Moore, and Marlon Deandre Moore (collectively, "Defendants") ANSWER to #1 Complaint, PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, MONETARY RELIEF, AND OTHER RELIEF by BINT Operations LLC.(Godwin, Donald)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by All Defendants (Godwin, Donald)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Gallegos, Luis)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #31 First MOTION for Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the proposed order was filed on the public docket in error. (jak)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (Godwin, Donald)(Docket text modified on 4/11/2022 to indicate the proposed order was filed in error)(jak)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants (Godwin, Donald)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #10 defendants' motion to dismiss or transfer venue. The Court also denies as moot defendants' outstanding motions #18 , #23 , #26 , that were contingent upon the resolution of the motion to dismiss or transfer venue. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/31/2022. (jak)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A (Production requirements), #2 Attachment B (Email from defense counsel))(Tepfer, Reid)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by All Defendants (Godwin, Donald)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 First MOTION for Protective Order filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support re #23 First MOTION for Protective Order filed by All Defendants. (Godwin, Donald)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 First MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Godwin, Donald)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, Marlon DeAndre Moore.(Godwin, Donald)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 First MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Adjudication of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Tepfer, Reid)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Denise Land on behalf of Arkansas, State of (Land, Amanda)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Adjudication of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Godwin, Donald)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 First MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Adjudication of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by All Defendants (Godwin, Donald)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/22/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/8/2022; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/17/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/22/2021. (tmw)
September 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 First MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by All Defendants. (Godwin, Donald)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 motion for leave to file a reply to plaintiffs' #12 response in opposition to defendants' #10 motion to dismiss. Defendants have up to and including 9/6/2021, to file a reply to plaintiffs' response to defendants motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/31/2021. (jbh)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 First MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Tepfer, Reid)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by All Defendants (Godwin, Donald)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Tepfer, Reid)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Memorandum in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #10 Motion to Dismiss and to include the party filers as BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore, and Marlon DeAndre Moore as marked on the document. (jak)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue filed by BINT Operations LLC, LaShonda Moore and Marlon Deandre Moore. (McGregor, Stefanie) (Docket text modified on 8/5/2021 to establish linkage and to include the party filers) (jak).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Defendants (McGregor, Stefanie)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time and #8 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Defendants have up to and including 8/4/2021, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Mr. Godwin may appear pro hac vice without local counsel for the pendency of this litigation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/15/2021. (jbh)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Donald E Godwin filed by All Defendants. Fee $100.00. Receipt # LIT082915. (fjg)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Extend the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (fjg)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon BINT Operations LLC, filed by Federal Trade Commission. BINT Operations LLC served on 6/25/2021. (Tepfer, Reid)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Marlon Moore, individually, filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Marlon Moore as an Officer of BINT Operations LLC, filed by Federal Trade Commission. Marlon DeAndre Moore served on 6/23/2021. (Tepfer, Reid)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon LaShonda Moore, individually, filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service (LaShonda Moore as an officer of BINT Operations LLC), filed by Federal Trade Commission. LaShonda Moore served on 6/23/2021. (Tepfer, Reid)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name and description as, "filed by Federal Trade Commission and Arkansas, State of." (cmn)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, MONETARY RELIEF, AND OTHER RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Federal Trade Commission and Arkansas, State of. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Docket text modified on 6/17/2021 to correct party name.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. BINT Operations LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon DeAndre Moore
Represented By: Donald E. Godwin
Represented By: Stefanie Major McGregor
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Kristin M. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon DeAndre Maiden
Represented By: Donald E. Godwin
Represented By: Stefanie Major McGregor
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Kristin M. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BINT Operations LLC
Represented By: Donald E. Godwin
Represented By: Stefanie Major McGregor
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Kristin M. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaShonda Moore
Represented By: Donald E. Godwin
Represented By: Stefanie Major McGregor
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Kristin M. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: David A.F. McCoy
Represented By: Shannon L. Halijan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Luis Gallegos
Represented By: Reid Abram Tepfer
Represented By: Luis H. Gallegos
Represented By: Anne D. LeJeune
Represented By: David Alex
Represented By: Serena Mosley-Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: David A.F. McCoy
Represented By: Shannon L. Halijan
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Represented By: Jason Allen Epperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?