Doe v. Hospitality Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Hospitality Solutions Inc doing business as Extendastay Motel and Does John Does 1-4 and John Doe Entities 1-4
Case Number: 4:2021cv00591
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the party served as Hospitality Solutions Inc. as marked on the document. (jak)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by All Plaintiffs. Hospitality Solutions Inc served on 8/3/2021. (Manatt, Lauren) (Docket text modified on 8/26/2021 to indicate the party served) (jak)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does, Hospitality Solutions Inc filed by Jane Doe. (Fee $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082703.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Hospitality Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality Solutions Inc doing business as Extendastay Motel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does John Does 1-4 and John Doe Entities 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Meredith S. Moore
Represented By: Lauren Alexander Manatt
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?