Witt Caribbean LLC v. Atlys Global LLC
Plaintiff: Witt Caribbean LLC
Defendant: Atlys Global LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00618
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint motion, Doc. #10 , granted. Case stayed until 10 September 2021. The stay will end automatically on that date unless the Court enters a further Order. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/11/2021. (crw)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines by Witt Caribbean LLC (Crass, Kevin)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Witt Caribbean LLC (Crass, Kevin)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Witt Caribbean LLC. (Crass, Kevin)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER:Unopposed motion, Doc. #6 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 18 August 2021. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2021. (slb)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Notice of Removal by All Defendants (Potts, Dylan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by Franklin Robinson. (jbh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Atlys Global LLC, filed by Witt Caribbean LLC. (jbh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Atlys Global LLC from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-21-02927. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT082865. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle W. Owens on behalf of Atlys Global LLC (Owens, Danielle)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Hugh Potts on behalf of Atlys Global LLC (Potts, Dylan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witt Caribbean LLC v. Atlys Global LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Witt Caribbean LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlys Global LLC
Represented By: Danielle W. Owens
Represented By: Dylan Hugh Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?