Foley v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jack Foley
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, AT&T Inc and AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3
Case Number: 4:2021cv00635
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER staying the remaining deadlines for 60 days from the date of this order, pending the finalization of the release and settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/29/2022. (ljb)
June 28, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Jack Foley's motion for extension of time. Foley must submit his brief on or before 6/28/2022. Defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 thereafter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/27/2022. (ljb)
May 27, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Jack Foley's motion for extension of time in which to file brief. Foley must submit his brief on or before 5/29/2022. Defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/27/2022. (ljb)
April 26, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon)
April 15, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 of Filing Stipulated Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LTD File Part 1 of 2 AR 1-225, #2 Exhibit 2 - LTD File Part 2 of 2 AR 226-310, #3 Exhibit 3 - STD File Part 1 of 2 AR 311-668, #4 Exhibit 4 - STD File Part 2 of 2 AR 669-894, #5 Exhibit 5 - Plan Doc - UBP#3 ATT 1-51, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plan Doc - SPD ATT 52-100, #7 Exhibit 7 - Job Desc - Prem Tech)(Snipe, Sheldon)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Jack Foley's motion for extension of time to file the administrative record. The case will proceed on the following schedule: stipulated record shall be filed no later than 4/18/2022; plaintiff's brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter; defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/4/2022. (ljb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Record by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon)
February 3, 2022 Filing 15 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER: The stipulated record shall be filed no later than 4/4/2022; plaintiff's brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter; defendants' brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. No reply briefs will be allowed unless leave has been granted. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/3/2022. (ljb)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Margaret Hobbs Benson terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/15/21. (rdr)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 (Benson, Margaret)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice of Sheldon W. Snipe. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/26/2021. (ljb)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 (Madison, Eva)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3.(Madison, Eva)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hobbs Benson on behalf of AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 (Benson, Margaret)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sheldon W. Snipe. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4083817. Filed by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 (Madison, Eva)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3 (Madison, Eva)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to #4 Jack Foley's stipulation of voluntary dismissal, defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc., is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/12/2021. (kdr)
August 12, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name as "AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, filed by Jack Foley (Lacy, Brandon) (Docket text modified on 8/12/2021 to correct party name.)(cmn)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. by Jack Foley. (Lacy, Brandon)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Jack Foley. AT&T Inc served on 7/23/2021. (Lacy, Brandon)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Jack Foley. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc served on 7/28/2021. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jack Foley. (Fee of $402. Receipt Number LIT082967. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foley v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Foley
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No 3
Represented By: Sheldon W. Snipe
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Margaret Hobbs Benson
Represented By: Sheldon Winford Snipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?