Reed et al v. Nissan North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Reed and Isaac McCombs
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc, John Does and Nissan Motor Co Ltd
Case Number: 4:2021cv00652
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Nissan North America Inc.(Drennon, Baxter)
August 11, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct party names as follows, "AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Kathryn Reed, Isaac McCombs. (summons issued to Nissan Motor Co Ltd and given to attorney for plaintiffs)" as indicated by the document.(cmn)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kathryn Reed, Isaac McCombs. (summons issued to Nissan Motor Co Ltd and given to attorney for plaintiffs) (jap) (Docket text modified on 8/11/2021 correct party names.) (cmn)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/4/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/18/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 1/30/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/4/2021. (ljb)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Nissan North America Inc (Drennon, Baxter)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nissan North America Inc.(Drennon, Baxter)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Kathryn Reed and Isaac McCombs.(kdr)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nissan North America Inc from Saline County Circuit Court, case number 63CV-21-465. Fee of $402 receipt number LIT083002. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. Nissan North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Reed
Represented By: Nader Gregory Afsordeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac McCombs
Represented By: Nader Gregory Afsordeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?