Donato v. Enkelkinder LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert A Donato
Defendant: Enkelkinder LLC, Plaza Tire Service Inc, Timothy M Campbell, Rodolfo Refugio Jose Maria and Fleetwash Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00657
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Timothy M Campbell, Enkelkinder LLC, Plaza Tire Service Inc. (Knisley, Kathryn)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #15 motion to appear pro hac vice by Erin Shea for plaintiff Robert A. Donato. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/31/2021. (ljb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Erin Shea. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4087524. Filed by Robert A Donato (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Benton, Alexandra)
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Timothy M Campbell, Enkelkinder LLC, Plaza Tire Service Inc (Huckabay, D.)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/6/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/19/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/6/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/4/2021. (ljb)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fleetwash Inc, Rodolfo Refugio Jose Maria.(Hester, Stephen)(Docket text modified on 7/29/2021 to establish linkage) (jak)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert A Donato. (Benton, Alexandra)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert A Donato. (Benton, Alexandra)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Robert A Donato. Rodolfo Refugio Jose Maria served on 7/22/2021. (Benton, Alexandra)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Robert A Donato. Fleetwash Inc served on 7/22/2021. (Benton, Alexandra)
July 29, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #12 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #2 Complaint. (jak)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Robert A Donato. Plaza Tire Service Inc served on 7/13/2021. (Benton, Alexandra)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Robert A Donato. Enkelkinder LLC served on 7/13/2021. (Benton, Alexandra)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fleetwash Inc, Rodolfo Refugio Jose Maria.(Hester, Stephen)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Alexander Hester on behalf of Fleetwash Inc, Rodolfo Refugio Jose Maria (Hester, Stephen)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Timothy M Campbell, Enkelkinder LLC and Plaza Tire Service Inc.(kdr)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Robert A Donato.(kdr)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Timothy M Campbell, Enkelkinder LLC and Plaza Tire Service Inc from White County Circuit Court, Case Number 73CV-2021-329. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083028. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donato v. Enkelkinder LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Donato
Represented By: Alexandra C. Benton
Represented By: Erin Melton Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enkelkinder LLC
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Tire Service Inc
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M Campbell
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Refugio Jose Maria
Represented By: Stephen Alexander Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetwash Inc
Represented By: Stephen Alexander Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?