Williams v. Payne
Plaintiff: Jordan Williams
Defendant: Hempstead County Detention Center and Dexter Payne
Case Number: 4:2021cv00694
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jordan Williams. (kdr)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Petitioner is directed to file a Response on or before 9/30/2021 to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/22/2021. (csf)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/21/2021. (jbh)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dexter Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Trial Record, #3 Exhibit 2 - Opinion 2018 Ark. App. 277, #4 Exhibit 3 - Direct Appeal Briefs, #5 Exhibit 4 - Mandate, #6 Exhibit 5 - Rule 37 Petition, #7 Exhibit 6 - Order Denying Rule 37 Petition, #8 Exhibit 7 - Motion for Belated Appeal)(Jones, Jacob)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne (Jones, Jacob)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (csf)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Helderman Jones on behalf of Dexter Payne (Jones, Jacob)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Williams' Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General by mail; and directing the Respondent to file an answer, motion, or other response within 21 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/24/2021. (kdr)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jordan Williams. (kdr)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send Williams an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit; directing Williams to 1) file the completed Application, including the Certificate of Prisoner Accounts; or 2) pay the $5.00 filing fee, in full; and directing the Clerk of Court to change the Respondent from "Hempstead County Detention Center" to Dexter Payne, Director of the Arkansas Division of Correction. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/3/2021. (kdr)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jordan Williams.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hempstead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Jacob Helderman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?