Arkansas, State of et al v. US CityLink Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of, Yell County Arkansas and Arkansas State Game and Fish Commission
Defendant: US CityLink Corporation and Harjinder Singh
Case Number: 4:2021cv00736
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Arkansas, State of, Yell County Arkansas. (Priebe, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/12/21. (rdr)
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Arkansas, State of, Yell County Arkansas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply)(Priebe, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Harjinder Singh, US CityLink Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Extend Time to Serve Singh, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service - Singh, #3 Exhibit 3 - AGFC Documents, #4 Exhibit 4 - Inspections, #5 Exhibit 5 - AR DOT)(Baber, Lauren)
September 27, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 MOTION to Remand. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "AMENDED MOTION to Remand" as marked on the document. (jak)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time to file response re #7 MOTION to remand to state court. Response due by 10/4/2021. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/24/21. (rdr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #8 Brief in Support by Harjinder Singh, US CityLink Corporation (Deacon, Joseph)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss - Voluntary Partial Dismissal by Arkansas State Game and Fish Commission (Goodhart, James)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Remand to State Court filed by Arkansas, State of, Yell County Arkansas. (Priebe, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION to Remand to State Court by Arkansas, State of, Yell County Arkansas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Priebe, Jeffrey) (Docket text modified on 9/27/2021 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Remand to State Court filed by Arkansas, State of, Yell County Arkansas. (Priebe, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Arkansas, State of, Yell County Arkansas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Priebe, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/28/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/10/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 3/6/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/23/2021. (ljb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 Amended ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Harjinder Singh, US CityLink Corporation.(Baber, Lauren)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Yell County Arkansas, Arkansas, State of and Arkansas State Game and Fish Commission.(kdr)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harjinder Singh from Yell County Circuit Court, Case Number 75SCV-21-3. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083350. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas, State of et al v. US CityLink Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Priebe
Represented By: Michael R. Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yell County Arkansas
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Priebe
Represented By: Michael R. Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas State Game and Fish Commission
Represented By: Christian N. Parks
Represented By: James R. Brown
Represented By: James Felix Goodhart
Represented By: John Parker Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US CityLink Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Oswalt Baber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harjinder Singh
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Oswalt Baber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?