Marshall v. Educational Credit Management Group et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Marshall
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Group and Educational Credit Management Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00751
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing this case be reassigned to the docket of Chief U.S. District Judge D.P. Marshall Jr., by chip exchange #4 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/19/2021. (kdr)
October 19, 2021 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #5 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Theresa Marshall; Case Number 4:19-cv-00913-DPM and 4:20-cv-01373-DPM. (fjg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend #1 by Theresa Marshall. (jap)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Theresa Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Theresa Marshall. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Educational Credit Management Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?