Shoup et al v. Arkansas Department of Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Furr Shoup and Zachary Shoup
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services and Cindy Gillespie
Case Number: 4:2021cv00761
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filers as Arkansas Department of Human Services and Cindy Gillespie as marked on the document. (jak)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Neil Rosen on behalf of All Defendants (Rosen, Richard)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Arkansas Department of Human Services and Cindy Gillespie.(Rosen, Richard)(Docket text modified on 9/29/2021 to correct the party filers) (jak)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Ashley Furr Shoup, Zachary Shoup. Cindy Gillespie served on 9/15/2021. (Stewart, Marc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Ashley Furr Shoup, Zachary Shoup. Arkansas Department of Human Services served on 9/15/2021. (Stewart, Marc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ashley Furr Shoup and Zachary Shoup. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083449.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoup et al v. Arkansas Department of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Furr Shoup
Represented By: Marc E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Shoup
Represented By: Marc E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Represented By: Richard Neil Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gillespie
Represented By: Richard Neil Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?