Stocker v. Bradley et al
Plaintiff: Earnest Larry Stocker
Defendant: Jimmy Bradley, Jack Rodgers, Alan Humphries, Cleveland County, Robin Carroll, Asa Hutchinson and Cleveland County Arkansas District Attorney's Office
Case Number: 4:2021cv00771
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: Consistent with the #9 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/6/2021. (jbh)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 motion to dismiss; dismissing the complaint without prejudice; and denying #4 motion to dismiss as moot. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/6/2021. (jbh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Jack Rodgers.(Dugger, Melissa) (Docket text modified on 10/7/2021 to remove duplicate text)(jak)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jack Rodgers. (Dugger, Melissa)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Jack Rodgers (Dugger, Melissa)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cleveland County Arkansas District Attorney's Office. (Mosley, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cleveland County Arkansas District Attorney's Office (Mosley, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Earnest Larry Stocker. (jap)
September 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to party for service. (fjg)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Earnest Larry Stocker. (fjg)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Earnest Larry Stocker. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083511. No summons issued.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stocker v. Bradley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest Larry Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Rodgers
Represented By: Melissa Dugger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland County Arkansas District Attorney's Office
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?