Hammett v. Weaver et al
Plaintiff: Laura Hammett
Defendant: Susan Kaye Weaver, Jana Perry, William Z White and Does 1-99
Case Number: 4:2021cv00857
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 Motion to Dismiss filed by William Z White. (Crabtree, Danny)
November 23, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by William Z White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Crabtree, Danny)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of USCA as to #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Laura Hammett: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (jbh)
November 17, 2021 Filing 17 USCA Docketing Letter as to #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Laura Hammett. USCA Case Number 21-3640. (jbh)
November 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #15 Notice of Appeal re #14 Order. (jbh)
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Order by Laura Hammett. Filing fee $505, receipt number LIT084526. (jbh)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Dismiss; declining to retain jurisdiction over the state law claims; dismissing this case; and denying #6 motion to stay discovery as moot. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/21/2021. (jbh)
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #12 Response to Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Laura Hammett. (fjg)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Laura Hammett. (fjg)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jana Perry, Susan Kaye Weaver. (Mosley, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support of #9 Response to Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Laura Hammett. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit in Support, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit in Support, #4 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit in Support). (jap)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Laura Hammett. (jap)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to William Z White by William Z White. (Crabtree, Danny)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Jana Perry, Susan Kaye Weaver. (Mosley, Michael)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Jana Perry, Susan Kaye Weaver (Mosley, Michael)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/21/2021. Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/4/2022. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 10/13/21. (mmb)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jana Perry, Susan Kaye Weaver. (Mosley, Michael)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jana Perry, Susan Kaye Weaver (Mosley, Michael)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Allen Mosley on behalf of Jana Perry, Susan Kaye Weaver (Mosley, Michael)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Laura Hammett. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083836.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammett v. Weaver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hammett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kaye Weaver
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Perry
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Z White
Represented By: Danny R. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?