Mills v. Bennett
Plaintiff: Alfiya Mills
Defendant: Jamar Bennett
Case Number: 4:2021cv00861
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Allen Wood on behalf of Jamar Bennett (Wood, Russell)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/9/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/22/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/3/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/4/2021. (ljb)
October 4, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Amended Document. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #2 Complaint. (jak)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Jamar Bennett. (Mann, William) (Docket text modified on 10/4/2021 to establish linkage) (jak)
September 29, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Complaint, and #3 Answer to Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entries were modified to correct the file date as 9/28/2021 as marked on the documents.(jak)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jamar Bennett.(ldb) (Docket entry modified on 9/29/2021 to correct the file date) (jak)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jamar Bennett, filed by Alfiya Mills.(ldb)(Docket entry modified on 9/29/2021 to correct the file date) (jak)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jamar Bennett from Saline County Circuit Court, Case Number 63CV-21-762-3. Fee of $ 402 paid, receipt number LIT083858. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ldb)(Docket entry modified on 9/29/2021 to correct the file date) (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfiya Mills
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamar Bennett
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Represented By: Russell Allen Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?