Taylor v. Little Rock Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Domeneque D Taylor
Defendant: Little Rock Police Department, Kenton Buckner, Antonio McNutt, Keith Creemens, Don Hampton, David Fulton, Jr, Adam Gortney, Paige Susan Cline, Rick Harmon, Steve Dodge, Robert Mourot, Emmanuel R Estrada, Dennis Swinford, Jonathan Gonzalez, Gregory Birkhead, Joshua Hardin and David Fulton
Case Number: 4:2021cv00866
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 SEALED REQUEST. (fjg)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 11 Domeneque Taylor's motion for leave to amend her complaint. Taylor's case remains stayed. Taylor is directed to provide notice when the state criminal case is resolved and must report on its status no later than 4/8/2022. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/17/2021. (ljb)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 SEALED Motion. (jap)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Domeneque Taylor's motion to lift the stay because her state criminal case is still pending. Taylor is directed to provide notice when the state criminal case is resolved and must report on its status no later than 4/8/2022. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/4/2021. (ljb)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Domeneque D Taylor (Attachments: #1 Notice - pages 64-130, #2 Notice - pages 131-238). (jap)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Domeneque D Taylor. (fjg)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE filed by Domeneque D Taylor. (fjg)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER reconsidering #3 order and granting #1 Domeneque Taylor's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Taylor is not required to pay the filing fee. This case is stayed until Taylor's state criminal case is concluded. Taylor is directed to provide notice when the criminal case is concluded and must report on its status no later than 4/8/2022. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/14/2021. (ljb)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Photos by Domeneque D Taylor. (jap)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Domeneque D Taylor. (jap)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Domeneque Taylor's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Taylor to make an initial payment of $10 towards his filing fee and to pay $5 each month subsequently until the $402 is paid in full. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/4/2021. (ljb)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Domeneque D Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Complaint)(kdr)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Domeneque D Taylor. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Little Rock Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domeneque D Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Creemens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fulton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Gortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Susan Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mourot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel R Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Swinford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Birkhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?