Marsh v. Payne
Plaintiff: John William Marsh
Defendant: Arkansas, State of and Dexter Payne
Case Number: 4:2021cv00869
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Donner Jackson on behalf of Dexter Payne (Jackson, Adam)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General by regular mail. Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other pleading responsive to the Petition within 40 days after service of the Petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/20/2021. (lej)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $5.00 Received, receipt number LIT084153. (mdo)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk shall mail to Petitioner an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either (1) pay the $5 statutory filing fee in full; or (2) file a properly completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. Failure to timely and properly comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/30/2021. (lej)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John William Marsh. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John William Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Adam Donner Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?