Armstrong v. Payne
Plaintiff: Matthew Armstrong
Defendant: Arkansas, State of and Dexter Payne
Case Number: 4:2021cv00871
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Reply. CORRECTION: The event entry was corrected to "Answer to Complaint" and the docket text was corrected to "Response" as indicated on the document. (kbc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Continued)(Warthen, Christopher) Docket text modified on 11/18/2021 to correct description. (kbc)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ray Warthen on behalf of Dexter Payne (Warthen, Christopher)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #1 . The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of the #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General by regular mail. Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other pleading responsive to the petition within 40 days after service of the petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/4/2021. (lej)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Matthew Armstrong. (llg)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Armstrong. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Christopher Ray Warthen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?