Turner v. Sweet et al
Plaintiff: Adrian M Turner
Defendant: Rowdy Sweet, Does "Nurse Kaseey", "Nurse Connie", Connie and Kaseey
Case Number: 4:2021cv00884
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Joe J Volpe
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Rowdy Sweet served on 11/19/2021. (kth)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Connie served on 11/19/2021. (kth)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Kaseey served on 11/19/2021. (kth)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving and adopting the Partial Recommended Deposition in all respects. Accordingly, Plaintiff may proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against Defendants Sweet, Kaseey (last name unknown), and Connie (last name unknown) in their individual capacities only. Plaintiffs official capacity claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. I certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/29/21. (mmb)
November 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to Connie, Kaseey and Rowdy Sweet. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff be allowed to proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against Defendants Sweet, Kaseey, and Connie in their individual capacities only. Plaintiff's official capacity claims be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/4/2021. (lej)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Clerk prepare summons and the USM serve Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/4/2021. (lej)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/3/2021. (lej)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Adrian M Turner. (llg)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adrian M Turner. (llg)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application #1 . The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to the Pope County Detention Center Jail Administrator. Service is not appropriate at this time. The Clerk shall mail a copy of the complaint and a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form to Plaintiff #2 . If Plaintiff wishes to amend the complaint, he must complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/8/2021. (lej)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Adrian M Turner. (llg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adrian M Turner. (llg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2021: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Sweet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian M Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowdy Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does "Nurse Kaseey", "Nurse Connie"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaseey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?