Wojtarowicz v. University of Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Heather Wojtarowicz
Defendant: University of Arkansas, University of Arkansas at Little Rock, University of Arkansas at Little Rock Alumni Association and University of Arkansas Little Rock
Case Number: 4:2021cv00906
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12111
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Pipkin, Mindy)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage to #1 Complaint and to add Exhibit A pursuant to the attached correspondence.(kbc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct re #1 Complaint by Heather Wojtarowicz (Hodges, David) Additional attachment added on 11/18/2021: #1 Exhibit A. Docket text modified on 11/18/2021 to establish linkage. (kbc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Response to Motion To Dismiss filed by Heather Wojtarowicz. (Hodges, David)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Heather Wojtarowicz. (Hodges, David)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by University of Arkansas, University of Arkansas at Little Rock Alumni Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pipkin, Mindy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () by University of Arkansas, University of Arkansas at Little Rock Alumni Association (Pipkin, Mindy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mindy D. Pipkin on behalf of All Defendants (Pipkin, Mindy)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint & Summons , filed by Heather Wojtarowicz. University of Arkansas served on 10/18/2021. (Hodges, David)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint & Summons , filed by Heather Wojtarowicz. Heather Wojtarowicz served on 10/18/2021. (Hodges, David)
October 7, 2021 Summons Issued as to University of Arkansas and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
October 7, 2021 Summons Issued as to University of Arkansas at Little Rock Alumni Association and returned to counsel for service. (kth)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Heather Wojtarowicz. No summons issued. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083989.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wojtarowicz v. University of Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas
Represented By: Mindy D. Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas at Little Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas at Little Rock Alumni Association
Represented By: Mindy D. Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas Little Rock
Represented By: Mindy D. Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Wojtarowicz
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?