Rowan v. PepsiCo Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Rowan
Defendant: PepsiCo Inc, New Bern Transportation Corporation and Bryson Juriel Bowers
Case Number: 4:2021cv00911
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Bryson Juriel Bowers, New Bern Transportation Corporation, PepsiCo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Charles Biener)(Jones, Gregory)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Tiffany Rowan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint)(Chaney, Sterling)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tiffany Rowan. (Chaney, Sterling)
October 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to Bryson Juriel Bowers, New Bern Transportation Corporation, PepsiCo Inc. and returned to counsel for plaintiff. (jap)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by New Bern Transportation Corporation, PepsiCo Inc. (Jones, Alexander)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by New Bern Transportation Corporation, PepsiCo Inc (Jones, Alexander)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal by New Bern Transportation Corporation, PepsiCo Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint)(Jones, Alexander)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Tiffany Rowan. (jbh)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Bern Transportation Corporation, PepsiCo Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-21-05566. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT084028. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowan v. PepsiCo Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Rowan
Represented By: Donald P. Chaney, Jr.
Represented By: Sterling Taylor Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo Inc
Represented By: Alexander Taylor Jones
Represented By: Gregory T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Bern Transportation Corporation
Represented By: Alexander Taylor Jones
Represented By: Gregory T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryson Juriel Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?