Head v. Social Security Administration et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Head
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Casey Hendrix, Wexler, Kevin Brooks and Does Jacob 1-2, Austin, Individually and in their Official Capacity
Case Number: 4:2021cv00916
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file the mailing addresses of each Defendant on or before 10/28/2021; and granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/14/2021. (llg)
October 13, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the title of the document as, "PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT & FOR DAMAGES FOR VIOLATIONS OF CONSTUTIONAL RIGHTS" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT & FOR DAMAGES FOR VIOLATIONS OF CONSTUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Samantha Head against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ldb) (Docket text modified on 10/13/2021 to correct description.)(cmn)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samantha Head. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Head v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Head
Represented By: Mickey Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Jacob 1-2, Austin, Individually and in their Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?