Stepps v. University of Arkansas Medical System
Plaintiff: Kristopher Stepps
Defendant: University of Arkansas Medical System
Case Number: 4:2021cv00986
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Summons Issued as to University of Arkansas Medical System and returned via mail to counsel for plaintiff. (jap)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 11/8/2021. (hml)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint and #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice lack an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (cmn)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jerry Girley. Fee $100; receipt number LIT084291. (ldb)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kristopher Stepps against University of Arkansas Medical System (Fee $402; Receipt Number LIT084290). No summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stepps v. University of Arkansas Medical System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Stepps
Represented By: Jerry Girley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas Medical System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?