State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. Lensing et al
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Kelley Lensing, Joseph Lensing, Teresa Sturch and Rustey Williams
Case Number: 4:2021cv01080
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kelley Lensing.(Sutterfield, Michael)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. Kelley Lensing served on 11/29/2021. (Wineland, Teresa)
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. Joseph Lensing served on 11/29/2021. (Wineland, Teresa)
November 26, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Teresa Sturch.(Norwood, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (jbh)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to File Reference List under Seal by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (jbh)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084468.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. Lensing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley Lensing
Represented By: Michael U. Sutterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Sturch
Represented By: Andrew Payne Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rustey Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?