Edogun v. Walmart Supercenter
Plaintiff: Adesuwa P Edogun
Defendant: Walmart Supercenter
Case Number: 4:2021cv01157
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/28/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/14/2022. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 1/17/2023 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Walmart Supercenter served on 12/10/2021. (kth)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Supercenter re #8 Notice of Appearance, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), #5 Answer to Complaint, #6 Notice of Appearance (Wray, Scott)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peyton Caroline Watts on behalf of Walmart Supercenter (Watts, Peyton)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Walmart Supercenter (Wray, Scott)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Edward Wray on behalf of Walmart Supercenter (Wray, Scott)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Supercenter.(Wray, Scott)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff Adesuwa Edogun's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for service upon Defendant Walmart, Inc., through its registered agent C.T. Corporation System; and directing the United United States Marshal to serve the summons, along with a copy of the Complaint and this Order on the Defendant, consistent with the provisions of Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/30/2021. (llg)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entries were modified to correct the file date as 11/24/2021 as marked on the documents. (jak)
November 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to Walmart Supercenter and forwarded to the United States Marshal for service. (llg)
November 26, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adesuwa P Edogun. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edogun v. Walmart Supercenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adesuwa P Edogun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Supercenter
Represented By: Peyton Caroline Watts
Represented By: Scott Edward Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?