Reliance Health Care Inc v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Plaintiff: Reliance Health Care Inc
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Case Number: 4:2021cv01164
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 #7 motions to admit Mr. Brady and Mr. Gerth pro hac vice pursuant to Local Rule 83.5(d). They shall appear as counsel of record for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/9/2021. (kdr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nicholas S Gerth. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4158475. Filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Wolf, Timothy)
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert L Brady. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4158461. Filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Wolf, Timothy)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/31/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/14/2022; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/17/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/02/2021. (tmw)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Wolf, Timothy)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal (Wolf, Timothy)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, filed by Reliance Health Care Inc. (jbh)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury demand by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-21-01241. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT084668. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Docket text modified on 11/30/2021 to include reference to the Jury demand) (jak)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reliance Health Care Inc v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reliance Health Care Inc
Represented By: Kenneth P. Castleberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Represented By: Nicholas S. Gerth
Represented By: Robert L. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?