Ashley v. Benton, City of et al
Plaintiff: Patricia A Ashley
Defendant: Benton, City of and Does Benton City Council and Benton Chief of Police
Case Number: 4:2021cv01179
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Order filed by Patricia A Ashley. (fjg)
January 19, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing by Patricia A Ashley. (fjg)
January 19, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing by Patricia A Ashley. (fjg)
January 19, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "BRIEF IN SUPPORT" as marked on the document. (jak)
January 18, 2022 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/15/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/29/2022; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 12/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 01/18/2022. (tmw)
January 14, 2022 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Dismiss by Benton, City of (Drennon, Baxter) (Docket text modified on 1/19/2022 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Drennon, Baxter)
January 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Patricia A Ashley of filing return receipt of certified mail addressed to Scotty Hodges, Chief of Police, Benton, AR. (jap)
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Patricia A Ashley. (jap)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing USPS Product Tracking & Reporting. Filed by Patricia A Ashley. (jap)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing returned receipt of certified mail addressed to Mayor Tom Farmer, City of Benton. Filed by Patricia A Ashley. (jap)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing returned receipt of certified mail addressed to Ms. Bridget George. Filed by Patricia A Ashley. (jap)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE filed by Patricia A Ashley. (fjg)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE filed by Patricia A Ashley. (fjg)
December 29, 2021 Summons Reissued as to All Defendants and returned to party for service. (kth)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE filed by Patricia A Ashley. (fjg)
December 15, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to party for service. (fjg)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the clerk to reassign this case to Judge Kristine G. Baker because it is related to Ashley v. Hodges et al., case number 4:20-cv-01125-KGB. General Order 39. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/8/2021. (kdr)
December 8, 2021 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related re Case Number 4:20-cv-1125 KGB by Patricia A Ashley. (kdr)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patricia A Ashley. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084765. Summons not issued.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Benton, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton, City of
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Benton City Council and Benton Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?