Arkansas State Conference NAACP et al v. Arkansas Board of Apportionment et al
Plaintiff: Arkansas State Conference NAACP and Arkansas Public Policy Panel
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Apportionment, Asa Hutchinson, John Thurston, Leslie Rutledge and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 4:2021cv01239
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #103 Notice of Appeal: Copies of #86 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 1, #87 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 2, #88 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 3, #93 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 4, #94 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 5. (jbh)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number LIT085672 re #103 Notice of Appeal filed by Arkansas State Conference NAACP, Arkansas Public Policy Panel. (jbh)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 USCA Docketing Letter as to #103 Notice of Appeal filed by Arkansas State Conference NAACP, Arkansas Public Policy Panel. USCA Case Number 22-1395. Transcript due by 4/5/2022.(cmn)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #103 Notice of Appeal re #100 Order and #102 Judgment. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTS SHOULD BE FILED WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERK. (cmn)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #100 Order, #102 Judgment by Arkansas Public Policy Panel, Arkansas State Conference NAACP. (Sullivan, Gary)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #100 Order, and in light of #101 Notice filed by the United States, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/22/2022. (ldb)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE by USA re #100 Order (Smith, Shannon)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/17/2022. (cmn)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 5 held on 2/8/2022, before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Court Reporters Karen Dellinger, Teresa Hollingsworth, and Valarie Flora. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 2/17/2022. Redaction Request due 3/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2022. (fcd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 4 held on 2/7/2022, before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Court Reporters Teresa Hollingsworth, Valarie Flora, and Karen Dellinger. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 2/17/2022. Redaction Request due 3/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2022. (fcd)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 COURT'S Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing.(hml)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Exhibit List by Arkansas Board of Apportionment, State of Arkansas, Asa Hutchinson, Leslie Rutledge, and John Thurston for Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (hml)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Witness List by Arkansas Board of Apportionment, State of Arkansas, Asa Hutchinson, Leslie Rutledge, and John Thurston for Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (hml)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Exhibit List by Arkansas Public Policy Panel and Arkansas State Conference NAACP for Preliminary Injunction Hearing.(hml)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Witness List by Arkansas Public Policy Panel and Arkansas State Conference NAACP for Preliminary Injunction Hearing.(hml)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky: Motion Hearing completed on 2/8/2022 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs presented closing statement. Plaintiffs and Defendants provided closing arguments. Court took the matter under advisement. Order to be entered under separate entry. (Plaintiffs: Bryan Sells, Gary Sullivan, Jonathan Topaz, and Neil Steiner; Defendants: Asher Steinberg, Nicholas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, and Jennifer Merritt; Court Reporters: Karen Dellinger, Teresa Hollingsworth, and Valarie Flora.) (hml)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky: Motion Hearing continued on 2/7/2022 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Witness testimony continued. Plaintiffs case completed. Defendants case began and completed. (Plaintiffs: Bryan Sells, Gary Sullivan, Jonathan Topaz, and Neil Steiner; Defendants: Asher Steinberg, Nicholas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, and Jennifer Merritt; Court Reporters: Teresa Hollingsworth, Valarie Flora, and Karen Dellinger.) (hml)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #89 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Allen Mosley terminated as counsel of record for the Defendants. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/7/2022. (hml)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants (Mosley, Michael)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 3 held on 2/5/2022, before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Court Reporters Teresa Hollingsworth and Valarie D. Flora. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 2/14/2022. Redaction Request due 2/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2022. (jbh)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 2 held on 2/2/2022, before Judge Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Court Reporters Valarie D. Flora, Karen Dellinger, and Elaine Hinson. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 2/14/2022. Redaction Request due 2/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2022. (jbh)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Volume 1 held on 2/1/2022, before Judge Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Court Reporters Valarie D. Flora and Teresa Hollingsworth. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 2/14/2022. Redaction Request due 2/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2022. (jbh)
February 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky: Motion Hearing continued on 2/5/2022 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Witness testimony continued. (Plaintiffs: Bryan Sells, Gary Sullivan, Jonathan Topaz, and Neil Steiner; Defendants: Asher Steinberg, Nicholas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, and Jennifer Merritt; Court Reporters: Valarie Flora and Teresa Hollingsworth.) (hml)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #79 Motion to Quash. For the reasons stated on the record at the beginning of the Preliminary Injunction hearing, this Motion to Quash is granted. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/02/2022. (gvl)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky: Motion Hearing continued on 2/2/2022 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Witness testimony continued. (Plaintiffs: Bryan Sells, Gary Sullivan, Jonathan Topaz, and Neil Steiner; Defendants: Asher Steinberg, Nicholas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, Jennifer Merritt, and Michael Mosley; Court Reporters: Valarie Flora, Karen Dellinger, and Elaine Hinson.) (hml)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION Joint by Arkansas Public Policy Panel, Arkansas State Conference NAACP. (Sullivan, Gary)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky: Motion Hearing began on 2/1/2022 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs' opening statement and witness testimony began. (Plaintiffs: Bryan Sells, Gary Sullivan, Jonathan Topaz, and Neil Steiner; Defendants: Asher Steinberg, Nicholas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, Jennifer Merritt, and Michael Mosley; Court Reporters: Valarie Flora and Teresa Hollingsworth.) (hml)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #79 Motion to Quash,, Motion to Expedite, filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Quash Eleventh-Hour Subpoenas, MOTION to Expedite and for Expedited Consideration () by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Niehaus Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Rhodes Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Email from Counsel)(Jacobs, Dylan)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DECLARATION of Josh Bridges by Arkansas Board of Apportionment, Arkansas, State of, Asa Hutchinson, Leslie Rutledge, John Thurston. (Steinberg, Asher)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Surreply filed by All Defendants. (Steinberg, Asher)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #71 STATEMENT of Interest filed by USA. CORRECTION: The original exhibits were attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The exhibits 1 and 2 were added to docket entry #71 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Allen Mosley on behalf of Arkansas Board of Apportionment, Arkansas, State of, Asa Hutchinson, Leslie Rutledge, John Thurston (Mosley, Michael)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Quash. The three constitutional officers at issue here do not need to attend, or testify, at the preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/31/2022. (ldb)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #50 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 01/29/2022. (gvl)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re #50 MOTION for Order Taking Judicial Notice of Census Data filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STATEMENT of Interest filed by USA. (fjg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2022: #1 Exhibit 1 - Correct (submitted 1/31/2022), #2 Exhibit 2 - Correct (submitted 1/31/2022)) (jak).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon S. Smith on behalf of USA. (fjg)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky: Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2022 re #59 MOTION to Quash. After hearing argument from the parties, the Court took the matter under advisement. (Plaintiffs: Angela Liu, Bryan Sells, Ceridwen Cherry, Gary Sullivan, Jonathan Topaz, and Neil Steiner; Defendants: Asher Steinberg, Nicholas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, and Jennifer Merritt; Court Reporter Valarie Flora.) (hml)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Document Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 15)(Sullivan, Gary)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION to Quash Constitutional-Officer Subpoenas MOTION to Expedite Consideration filed by Asa Hutchinson, Leslie Rutledge, John Thurston. (Jacobs, Dylan)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing on #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing reset for 2/1/2022 at 1:00 PM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (hml)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Telephone Hearing on #59 MOTION to Quash: Telephone Hearing reset for 1/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (hml) (Docket text modified on 1/24/2022 to correct a typographical error pursuant to instruction from Chambers) (jak)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Quash Constitutional-Officer Subpoenas MOTION to Expedite Consideration filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sullivan, Gary)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) I am vaccinated and boosted. Two members of my household (one is vaccinated and boosted; the other is not eligible for the vaccine) tested positive for Covid-19 in the last several days. Then, on Sunday, I developed symptoms consistent with Covid-19. Out of concern for the safety of Court staff, litigants, and attorneys, I have chosen to quarantine until I receive a PCR result. Given the current overload on the testing system, I am not sure when I will get that result. Accordingly, the in-person PI hearing will need to be rescheduled to start the first part of the first week of February. My courtroom deputy will reach out to the parties to work on scheduling. The telephonic hearing on the motion to quash subpoenas will be rescheduled to this Thursday. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 01/24/2022. (gvl)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 65 Notice of Telephone Hearing. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the date of the hearing as 1/27/2022 at 10:00 a.m. pursuant to instruction from Chambers.(jak)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Telephone Hearing on #59 MOTION to Quash: Telephone Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 12:30 PM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (hml)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER Granting in Part Request to Expedite. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to the Motion to Quash by 10:00 am (central time) on Monday, January 24, 2022. Defendants may file a Reply by 9:00 am (central time) on Tuesday, January 25, 2022. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on the issues presented by the Motion to Quash at 12:30 pm (central time) on Tuesday, January 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/21/2022. (nab)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #59 Motion to Quash, Motion to Expedite filed by Asa Hutchinson, Leslie Rutledge, John Thurston. (Jacobs, Dylan)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Quash Constitutional-Officer Subpoenas, MOTION to Expedite Consideration () by Asa Hutchinson, Leslie Rutledge, John Thurston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit Emails from counsel)(Jacobs, Dylan)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DECLARATION of Barry Jefferson by Arkansas State Conference NAACP. (Sullivan, Gary)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Bill Kopsky by Arkansas Public Policy Panel. re #44 Order,,. (Sullivan, Gary)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Merritt on behalf of All Defendants (Merritt, Jennifer)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: The Court expects the parties to be prepared to discuss at the hearing: (1) whether private right of action questions are considered jurisdictional in the Eighth Circuit; and (2) whether there is a private right of action that authorizes the claims brought and the relief sought by the Plaintiff-organizations in this case. Plaintiffs may address these questions in their forthcoming Reply Brief, and Defendants may address these questions in their standing-related Surreply. All parties should understand that, unless the Court concludes that private right of action questions are considered jurisdictional in the Eighth Circuit, any potential arguments in this area have been forfeited by Defendants for purposes of the Preliminary Injunction Motion. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/20/2022. (ldb)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing on #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (hml)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Declaration of Andy Davis, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, Declaration of Josh Bridges, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, Declaration of Finos Johnson, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, Report of Brad Lockerbie, Ph.D.)(Steinberg, Asher)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Bronni on behalf of All Defendants (Bronni, Nicholas)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan L. Jacobs on behalf of All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Order Taking Judicial Notice of Census Data by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - compiled census data)(Sells, Bryan)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER authorizing Ms. Angela Lin, Mr. Bryan Sells, Ms. Ceridwen Cherry, Mr. Gary Sullivan, Mr. Jonathan Topaz, Mr. Luke Reilly, Mr. Matthew Williams, Mr. Neil Steiner, Ms. Sophia Lakin, Mr. Asher Steinberg, and Mr. Stephen Najarian to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or person digital assistant into the courthouse on 1/27/2022 through 1/31/2022 for a hearing before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/18/2022. (hml)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 1/11/2022, before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Court Reporter Karen Dellinger. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 1/20/2022. Redaction Request due 2/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2022. (fcd)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #46 unopposed Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading deadline. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/13/2022. (nab)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants (Steinberg, Asher)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky: Telephone Conference held on 1/11/2022 to discuss administrative procedures for the upcoming preliminary injunction hearing. (Plaintiffs: Angela Liu, Bryan Sells, Ceridwen Cherry, Gary Sullivan, Jonathan Topaz, and Luke Reilly; Defendants: Asher Steinberg; Court Reporter: Karen Dellinger.) (hml)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER directing each Plaintiff to file an affidavit or declaration under penalty of perjury by 1/14/2022 that: (1) separately identifies each district of the 2021 Arkansas House of Representatives reapportionment map that Plaintiffs claim is "packed" or "cracked"; and (2) for each such district, provides a statement that informs the Court whether the Plaintiff has as a member of its organization an "African-American registered voter" who lives in the district. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/10/2022. (ldb)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 1:15 PM before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (hml)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying #27 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/5/2022. (ldb)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION for Recusal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sells, Bryan)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #39 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/5/2022. (hml)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Recusal by Arkansas Public Policy Panel, Arkansas State Conference NAACP (Attachments: #1 proposed reply brief)(Sells, Bryan)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Recusal filed by All Defendants. (Steinberg, Asher)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #30 Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Response(s) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction will now be due by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, January 19, 2022. Plaintiffs' Reply will be due by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, January 26, 2022. The preliminary injunction hearing will begin Thursday, January 27, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. There is good cause for a very limited extension of the briefing schedule--considering how fact intensive this case is and the size and scope of Plaintiffs' filings. However, Plaintiffs are still correct about the importance of getting to a decision without delay. The Court is hopeful that, on this schedule, it can still decide the preliminary injunction motion by the beginning of February. Today's order is without prejudice to Plaintiffs' recusal motion. The Court will decide that motion shortly, but the parties need a ruling on the schedule now. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/03/2022. (gvl)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER cancelling 33 Telephone Conference scheduled for 1/4/2022 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/3/2022. (hml)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arkansas Public Policy Panel, Arkansas State Conference NAACP. (Sells, Bryan)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #27 MOTION for Recusal. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #27 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (hml)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Plaintiffs have until 11:59 p.m. on Monday, January 3, 2022 to respond to #30 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/31/2021. (nab)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) If Defendants intend to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Recusal, they must do so on or before Tuesday, January 4, 2022. If Defendants do not intend to respond to the Motion, they must so inform the Court on or before Monday, January 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/31/2021. (nab)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Steinberg, Asher)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Asher Steinberg on behalf of All Defendants (Steinberg, Asher)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #27 Motion for Recusal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sells, Bryan)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Recusal by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Rudofsky Judicial Questionnaire, #2 Exhibit 2: Political Donations of Lee Rudofsky, #3 Exhibit 3: Code of Conduct for United States Judges)(Sells, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2022: #4 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/31/2021. (gvl)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/31/2021. (gvl)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/31/2021. (gvl)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Policy Panel, Arkansas State Conference NAACP (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Policy Panel, Arkansas State Conference NAACP (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Policy Panel, Arkansas State Conference NAACP (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Policy Panel, Arkansas State Conference NAACP (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Policy Panel, Arkansas State Conference NAACP (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) If any party believes the law requires this case to be heard by a three-judge panel, that party must file a motion explaining its position on or before Tuesday, January 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/30/2021. (nab)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sophia Lin Lakin. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4175633. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jonathan Topaz. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4175632. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ceridwen Cherry. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4175630. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/30/2021. (gvl)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/30/2021. (gvl)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/30/2021. (gvl)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/30/2021. (gvl)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/30/2021. (gvl)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting in part and denying in part the request for expedited briefing and consideration. The Court understands the need for expedited consideration of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. On the other hand, given the importance of the issues at bar, the complexity of the law in this area, and the significant factual development necessary in these types of cases, the Court does not want to short-change any party with respect to the briefing schedule. Defendants' response brief(s) will be due by 11:59 p.m. on Thursday, January 13, 2022. Plaintiffs may file a reply brief by 11:59 p.m. on Thursday, January 20, 2022. The Court will hold a preliminary injunction hearing on Monday, January 24, 2022. That hearing may last more than one day if necessary. The Court expects the parties to present both evidence and legal argument at the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court is focused on filing a written decision on the preliminary injunction motion by February 1, 2022. If any party believes that timeline presents insurmountable administrative or substantive problems, that party should file a motion for reconsideration of this timeline no later than the end of the day tomorrow.Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/30/2021. (nab)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Bryan L. Sells. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4175421. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Luke Reilly. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4175418. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew F. Williams. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4175415. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Neil A. Steiner. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4175412. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Sullivan, Gary)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Angela M. Liu. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4175407. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Sullivan, Gary)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sullivan, Gary)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7- part 1, #8 Exhibit 7- part 2, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Sullivan, Gary)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by Arkansas State Conference NAACP and Arkansas Public Policy Panel against All Defendants (Fee $ 402, Receipt Number LIT085017). Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas State Conference NAACP et al v. Arkansas Board of Apportionment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas State Conference NAACP
Represented By: Angela Liu
Represented By: Bryan L. Sells
Represented By: Ceridwen Cherry
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Luke Reilly
Represented By: Matthew F. Williams
Represented By: Neil Steiner
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Luke M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Public Policy Panel
Represented By: Angela Liu
Represented By: Bryan L. Sells
Represented By: Ceridwen Cherry
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Luke Reilly
Represented By: Matthew F. Williams
Represented By: Neil Steiner
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Luke M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Apportionment
Represented By: Asher Steinberg
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Represented By: Asher Steinberg
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Asher Steinberg
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Rutledge
Represented By: Asher Steinberg
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Asher Steinberg
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?