Meyers v. Autodesk Inc
Plaintiff: Kendall Meyers
Defendant: Autodesk Inc
Case Number: 4:2022cv00074
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Autodesk Inc (Hodges, M.)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #2 Complaint. Answer due by 3/25/2022. No further extensions. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/17/2022. (hml)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Autodesk Inc (Hodges, M.)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #2 Complaint. Answer due by 3/18/2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/14/2022. (hml)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Autodesk Inc (Hodges, M.)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #2 Complaint. Answer due 3/11/2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/7/2022. (hml)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Autodesk Inc (Hodges, M.)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to #2 Complaint. Answer due 3/3/2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/22/2022. (hml)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Autodesk Inc (Hodges, M.)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to #2 Complaint. Answer due 2/17/2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/7/2022. (hml)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Autodesk Inc (Hodges, M.)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kendall Meyers against Autodesk Inc. (ldb)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Autodesk Inc from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-21-1401. Fee of $402 paid, receipt number LIT085369. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. Autodesk Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Meyers
Represented By: Tabatha Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autodesk Inc
Represented By: M. Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?