Crow et al v. Little Rock, City of et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Crow and Jonathan Gonzalez
Defendant: Little Rock, City of and Little Rock Police Department
Case Number: 4:2022cv00083
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing continued on #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: MOTION HEARING reset for 5/11/2022 at 2:30 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. (kog)
March 9, 2022 Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing on #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : MOTION HEARING set for Friday, 4/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. (kog)
March 9, 2022 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/29/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/13/2022. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 4/17/2023 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
March 8, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST for Admissions by Kevin Crow, Jonathan Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(kth)
March 8, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Kevin Crow, Jonathan Gonzalez. (kth)
March 8, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Kevin Crow, Jonathan Gonzalez. (kth)
March 3, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event and description as, "ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Gonzalez's Retaliation Claim & RESPONSE to #6 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Little Rock, City of" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
March 3, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description as, "BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss Gonzalez's Retaliation Claim filed by Little Rock, City of" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss Gonzalez's Retaliation Claim filed by Little Rock, City of. (Betton, Alexander) (Docket text modified on 3/3/2022 to correct description.)(cmn)
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Gonzalez's Retaliation Claim & RESPONSE to #6 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Little Rock, City of.(Betton, Alexander) (Docket entry modified on 3/3/2022 to correct filing event and description.)(cmn)
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Newcomb, Robert)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Newcomb, Robert)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Betton on behalf of Little Rock Police Department, Little Rock, City of (Betton, Alexander)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Carpenter on behalf of Little Rock Police Department, Little Rock, City of (Carpenter, Thomas)
February 14, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description as, "AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Crow, Jonathan Gonzalez" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Kevin Crow, Jonathan Gonzalez. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Newcomb, Robert)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Crow, Jonathan Gonzalez.(Newcomb, Robert) (Docket text modified on 2/14/2022 to correct the description.)(cmn)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kevin Crow and Jonathan Gonzalez. Filing Fee Waived. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow et al v. Little Rock, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Crow
Represented By: Robert A. Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert A. Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Represented By: Alexander J. Betton
Represented By: Thomas M. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Police Department
Represented By: Alexander J. Betton
Represented By: Thomas M. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?