Kelley v. Pruett et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Kelley
Defendant: Chad Pruett and Terry Roper
Case Number: 4:2022cv00141
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #5 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
April 4, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to party for service. (fjg)
March 31, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Kelley. Faulkner County Sheriff Office served on 3/16/22. (docketed pursuant to instruction from Chambers) (jap)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Kelley. Chad Pruett served on 3/16/2022.(docketed pursuant to instruction from Chambers). (jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Kelley. Terry Roper served on 3/16/2022. (docketed pursuant to instruction from Chambers) (jap)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion to Set Aside filed by Chad Pruett, Terry Roper. (Lewis, Kaylen)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Set Aside Service of Process by Chad Pruett, Terry Roper (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons)(Lewis, Kaylen)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Raymond Kelley. No summons issued; blank summons provided to Plaintiff. (Fee of $402. Receipt Number LIT085585.) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Pruett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Pruett
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Roper
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?