Wells Fargo Bank NA v. PF Allied Gardens LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Defendant: PF Allied Gardens LLC, PF Jefferson Manor LLC, PF Northwest Acres LLC and PF Terrace Green LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00180
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original document was filed without the civil cover sheet. The civil cover sheet was added as an attachment to #1 docket entry and is attached hereto for service/review by the parties. (cmn)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. PF Terrace Green LLC served on 2/7/2022. (Moss, Jaimie)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. PF Northwest Acres LLC served on 2/7/2022. (Moss, Jaimie)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. PF Jefferson Manor LLC served on 2/7/2022. (Moss, Jaimie)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. PF Allied Gardens LLC served on 2/7/2022. (Moss, Jaimie)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Answer, #4 Notice of Appearance, and #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement lack an original signature (F.R.Cv. P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by PF Allied Gardens LLC, PF Jefferson Manor LLC, PF Northwest Acres LLC and PF Terrace Green LLC. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance for Defendants by Aubrey B. Greer and S. Joshua Kahane. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by PF Allied Gardens LLC, PF Jefferson Manor LLC, PF Northwest Acres LLC and PF Terrace Green LLC.(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE, REPLEVIN, AND OTHER RELIEF AND IMMEDIATE APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER against All Defendants, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(kdr)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PF Allied Gardens LLC, PF Jefferson Manor LLC, PF Northwest Acres LLC, and PF Terrace Green LLC from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-21-7757. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT085716. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2022: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank NA v. PF Allied Gardens LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Jacob Post Fair
Represented By: Jaimie Grunert Moss
Represented By: Kyle A. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PF Allied Gardens LLC
Represented By: Aubrey B. Greer
Represented By: S. Joshua Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PF Jefferson Manor LLC
Represented By: Aubrey B. Greer
Represented By: S. Joshua Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PF Northwest Acres LLC
Represented By: Aubrey B. Greer
Represented By: S. Joshua Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PF Terrace Green LLC
Represented By: Aubrey B. Greer
Represented By: S. Joshua Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?