Stephens v. United States Environmental Services LLC
Plaintiff: Donald Stephens
Defendant: United States Environmental Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00181
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion to Dismiss by United States Environmental Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Document USES' Proposed Reply)(Marshall, H.)
April 12, 2022 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/20/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/5/2022; Jury Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 10/16/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/12/2022. (ljb)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Donald Stephens. (Kees, William)
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or In The Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Donald Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Envelope and Notice from EEOC)(Kees, William)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William Cody Kees on behalf of Donald Stephens (Kees, William)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is not accompanied by a supporting brief (Local Rule 7.2(a)). (jak)
March 28, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or In The Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to include "and Brief in Support Thereof", as indicated on the corrected document. (kbc)
March 25, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or In The Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement and BRIEF IN SUPPORT Therof by United States Environmental Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Document Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Marshall, H.) Additional attachment added on 3/28/2022: #2 Main Document - Correct. Docket text modified on 3/28/2022 to correct description. (kbc)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Donald Stephens's motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/7/2022. (kdr)
March 4, 2022 Summons Reissued as to United States Environmental Services LLC and returned to party for service. (kth)
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Donald Stephens. (fjg)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER warning Donald Stephens that it is his responsibility to serve defendant with a copy of his complaint and summons within ninety days of filing the complaint, or his case may be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/1/2022. (kdr)
February 28, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date to 2/25/2022 as indicated on the document. (kbc)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States Environmental Services LLC, filed by Donald Stephens. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT085721. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) Docket entry modified on 2/28/2022 to correct file date. (kbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. United States Environmental Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Stephens
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Services LLC
Represented By: H. Barret Marshall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?