Absolute Essence LLC v. Public Consulting Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Absolute Essence LLC
Defendant: Public Consulting Group LLC, Public Consulting Group Inc, Public Consulting Holdings Group Inc, Veracious Investigative and Compliance Int'l LLC doing business as Veracious Solutions LLC doing business as Veracious Compliance Solutions LLC, Chad W Westom, Samaara Yael Robbins and Does Jane and John 1-10
Case Number: 4:2022cv00294
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal-Race Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #26 Motion to Extend Time to file a response to motions to dismiss #11 and #13 ; granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Samaara Yael Robbins. Answer due 6/13/2022. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/19/2022. (sjh)
May 19, 2022 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Samaara Yael Robbins (Applegate, Ryan)
May 19, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Applegate on behalf of Samaara Yael Robbins (Applegate, Ryan)
May 18, 2022 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Oppose Motions to Dismiss by Absolute Essence LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Simmons, Matthew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Veracious Investigative and Compliance Int'l LLC, Chad W Westom (Niswanger, Stephen)
May 12, 2022 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Absolute Essence LLC (Simmons, Matthew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #22 Deficiency Letter. CORRECTION: The original image file was attached in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #22 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
May 12, 2022 Filing 22 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #19 Motion to Dismiss notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
May 11, 2022 Filing 21 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #16 Motion notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
May 11, 2022 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Veracious Investigative and Compliance Int'l LLC, Chad W Westom. (Niswanger, Stephen)
May 11, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Veracious Investigative and Compliance Int'l LLC, Chad W Westom (Niswanger, Stephen)
May 11, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen B. Niswanger on behalf of Veracious Investigative and Compliance Int'l LLC, Chad W Westom (Niswanger, Stephen)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 5/20/2022. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/9/2022. (sjh)
May 6, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Brief in Support, #12 Brief in Support, #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Absolute Essence LLC (Giattina, Timothy)
April 27, 2022 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/9/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/23/2022. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 5/22/2023 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
April 26, 2022 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Public Consulting Group LLC, Public Consulting Holdings Group Inc. (Fortson, Grant)
April 26, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Public Consulting Group LLC, Public Consulting Holdings Group Inc (Fortson, Grant)
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Public Consulting Holdings Group Inc. (Fortson, Grant)
April 26, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Public Consulting Holdings Group Inc (Fortson, Grant)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff; and admitting Matt Simmons to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 04/21/2022. (llg)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to file a response to the Amended Complaint until April 26, 2022. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/6/2022. (sjh)
April 4, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Public Consulting Holdings Group Inc (Fortson, Grant)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Public Consulting Group LLC (Fortson, Grant)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #1 Notice of Removal notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time Unopposed Motion by Defendants Public Consulting Group, LLC and Public Consulting Group Holdings, Inc. For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Public Consulting Group Inc, Public Consulting Group LLC, Public Consulting Holdings Group Inc (Fortson, Grant)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 SWORN MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Matt Simmons. Filed by Absolute Essence LLC. (llg)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Absolute Essence LLC. (llg)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Absolute Essence LLC. (llg)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Public Consulting Group Inc, Public Consulting Group LLC, and Public Consulting Holdings Group Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-22-00210. Filing Fee of $402 paid, receipt number LIT086198. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Absolute Essence LLC v. Public Consulting Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Absolute Essence LLC
Represented By: Erin Cassinelli
Represented By: Matt Simmons
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Giattina
Represented By: Matthew H Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Consulting Group LLC
Represented By: Grant E. Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Consulting Group Inc
Represented By: Grant E. Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Consulting Holdings Group Inc
Represented By: Grant E. Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veracious Investigative and Compliance Int'l LLC doing business as Veracious Solutions LLC doing business as Veracious Compliance Solutions LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Niswanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad W Westom
Represented By: Stephen B. Niswanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samaara Yael Robbins
Represented By: Ryan J. Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Jane and John 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?